Marshall v. State of Wisconsin

Petitioner: David Marshall
Respondent: State of Wisconsin
Case Number: 1:2013cv00111
Filed: January 30, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Green Bay Office
County: Dodge
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 29, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 2/29/2016 DENYING 39 Petitioner's Motion for Reconsideration; DENYING AS MOOT 43 Petitioner's Second Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis; and GRANTING 48 Petitioner's Motion for Au thorization to Pay Appellate Filing Fee from Release Account. The court ORDERS that the Warden of Waupun CI shall withdraw $505 from the Petitioner's release account and forward that sum to the clerk of court as payment for the initial partial filing fee in this action no later than 3/25/2016. (cc: all counsel; by US Mail to Petitioner and Warden at Waupun CI) (pwm)
February 1, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 2/1/2016 DENYING 35 Petitioner's Request for Certificate of Appealability and Request for Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. (cc: all counsel; by US Mail to Petitioner)(pwm)
January 4, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 1/4/2016 DENYING 1 Habeas Corpus Petition and DISMISSING the petition effective immediately. The court further ORDERS that it will not issue a certificate of appealability. (cc: all counsel; by US Mail to petitioner)(pwm)
June 3, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 06/03/2013 denying 15 Motion for Order AND granting 16 Motion to Stay. Petitioner is directed to alert the Court at such time as his claim has been exhausted or to file a status report with this Court on December 1, 2013, whichever comes first. The motion to grant the petition is DENIED. The answer was timely filed. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAIL. (cc: all counsel by efile; Marshall by U.S. Mail) (Griesbach, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marshall v. State of Wisconsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Wisconsin
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - Habeas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?