Romper Room Inc et al v. Winmark Corporation
Plaintiff: Tammy Gering, Greg Gering, Romper Room II Inc and Romper Room Inc
Defendant: Winmark Corporation
Case Number: 1:2014cv01217
Filed: October 1, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Green Bay Office
County: Brown
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER FOR BOND re 18 Preliminary Injunction, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 10/15/2014. The injunction previously ordered by the Court will issue upon Plaintiffs posting a bond in the amount of $20,000. Absent further order of the Court, Defendant is enjoined from terminating the Franchise Agreements with Plaintiffs under which they are now operating their Green Bay and Appleton stores. See Order for full detail. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AMENDED DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 10/11/2014. This is a revised version which supersedes ECF 17 DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. See Decision and Order for full detail. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 10/10/2014. Upon determination and posting of an appropriate bond, Winmark is enjoined from terminating the Franchise Agreements absent further order of the Court. The Clerk is directed to set this matter on the courts calendar for a telephone conference to discuss the amount of the bond within the next week. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romper Room Inc et al v. Winmark Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Gering
Represented By: Cathleen A Dettmann
Represented By: Kevin J Palmersheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Gering
Represented By: Cathleen A Dettmann
Represented By: Kevin J Palmersheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Romper Room II Inc
Represented By: Kevin J Palmersheim
Represented By: Cathleen A Dettmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Romper Room Inc
Represented By: Kevin J Palmersheim
Represented By: Cathleen A Dettmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winmark Corporation
Represented By: Karla Vehrs
Represented By: Ansis V Viksnins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?