Fortune Avenue LLC v. Bedford
Plaintiff: Fortune Avenue LLC
Defendant: Howard Bedford
Case Number: 1:2018cv01362
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 10/16/2018. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
October 16, 2018 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William C Griesbach: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 10/16/2018. Plaintiffs Expert Witness List due by 12/1/2018, Defendants Expert Witness List due by 1/15/2019, Motions due by 4/30/2019, Rule 26(a) Disclosures to be exchanged by 11/15/2018. Court Trial set for 9/11/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 201, 125 S. Jefferson St., Green Bay, WI 54301 before Chief Judge William C Griesbach, with the understanding that the parties may move for a jury trial. (Tape #101618) (mac)
October 8, 2018 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Howard Bedford. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Smies, Jonathan)
October 1, 2018 NOTICE of RESCHEDULED Hearing: (cc: all counsel)RULE 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference originally scheduled for 10/4/16 has been RESCHEDULED at the unopposed request of counsel for 10/16/2018 at 09:20 AM in By Telephone before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. (lh)
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 Joint Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by All Plaintiffs. (Janssen, Robert)
September 19, 2018 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #5 Notice of Appearance filed by Fortune Avenue LLC ; Electronically filed documents should not be scanned whenever possible. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (lh)
September 18, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan M Froelich on behalf of Fortune Avenue LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Ryan M Froelich (Froelich, Ryan)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Howard Bedford.(Smies, Jonathan)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Hearing: (cc: all counsel) Scheduling Conference set for 10/4/2018 09:00 AM by Telephone before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov(cav)
September 4, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Howard Bedford. (Smies, Jonathan)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Howard Bedford from Brown County Circuit Court, Case Number: 18 CV 857 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2912182) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Admission of Service, #3 Exhibit Electronic Filing Notice from State Court Action, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smies, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fortune Avenue LLC v. Bedford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Bedford
Represented By: Jonathan T Smies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fortune Avenue LLC
Represented By: Robert J Janssen
Represented By: Ryan M Froelich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?