American Family Mutual Insurance Company v. Whirlpool Corporation

Plaintiff: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv01483
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 10/26/2018. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
October 26, 2018 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William C Griesbach: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 10/26/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 1/2/2019, Fact Discovery due by 7/15/2019, Party with Burden of Proof Expert Witness List due by 3/1/2019, Responding Party Expert Witness List due by 5/15/2019, Motions due by 7/15/2019, Rule 26(a) Disclosures to be exchanged by 11/9/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/1/2019 01:30 PM in Courtroom 201, 125 S. Jefferson St., Green Bay, WI 54301 before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. Jury Trial set for 11/12/2019 08:30 AM in Courtroom 201, 125 S. Jefferson St., Green Bay, WI 54301 before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. (Tape #102618) (mac)
October 5, 2018 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by American Family Mutual Insurance Company. (Nester, Hillary)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Whirlpool Corporation.(Burnett, George)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Hearing: (cc: all counsel)RULE 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/26/2018 09:00 AM By Telephone before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. (cav)
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Whirlpool Corporation. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Burnett, George)
September 21, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Whirlpool Corporation. (Burnett, George)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Whirlpool Corporation from Manitowoc County, Case Number: 18CV368 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2926834) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Defendant's Civil Cover Sheet)(Burnett, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Family Mutual Insurance Company v. Whirlpool Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Ronald W Harmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation
Represented By: George Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?