Owners Insurance Company et al v. Midea America Corporation et al

Plaintiff: James R Smith, Owners Insurance Company, Pinkert Law Firm, LLP and Pinkert Law Firm LLP
Defendant: Midea America Corporation, ABC Insurance Company, ABC Corporation, DEF Insurance Company, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company and DEF Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv01607
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Case dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41, upon the #7 Stipulation of the parties. All claims and causes of action that ere alleged or could have been alleged will be dismissed upon the merits, without prejudice, without further notice and without costs. (lh)
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal Pursuant to Federal Rule 41 by Owners Insurance Company, Pinkert Law Firm LLP, James R Smith. (Luedtke, Amanda)
October 17, 2018 NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2018 at 9:00 AM is cancelled pending the decision of #4 Motion to Dismiss, per law clerk ALK. (cc: all counsel) (mac)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company.(Sanders, Maria)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 BRIEF in Support filed by Midea America Corporation re #4 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Peng Xie)(Sanders, Maria)
October 16, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Midea America Corporation. (Sanders, Maria)
October 16, 2018 Filing 3 DUPLICATE FILING. See #4 Motion to Dismiss. NOTICE by Midea America Corporation of Motion and Motion to Dismiss (Sanders, Maria) Modified on 10/17/2018 (mac).
October 12, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Hearing: (cc: all counsel)Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2018 at 09:00 AM in By Telephone before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. The court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov(lh)
October 12, 2018 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #1 Notice of Removal; The description of the attachments contains duplicate text (Exhibit Ex). In the future, when attaching documents to the main document you may select a description from the category drop-down list but then you should not repeat that word in the description text box. For example, if you choose Exhibit from the drop-down list, then you may simply type A in the description text box and Exhibit A will appear on the docket. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (lh)
October 11, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
October 11, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Midea America Corporation, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company from Door County Circuit Court, Case Number: 18-CV-121 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2942018) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - State of MI Insurance Detail, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Plaintiffs' Counsel, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Plaintiffs Counsels Info., #5 Exhibit Ex. E - State of IL Insurance, #6 Exhibit Ex. F - Affidavit of Serv re Allianz, #7 Exhibit Ex. G - Affidavit of Ser re Midea America Corp, #8 Exhibit Ex. H - Adverse Party Notice of Filing of Removal, #9 Exhibit Ex. I - Notice of Filing of Removal, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Allianz Corp Disclosure Statement, #12 Midea Disclosure Statement)(Sanders, Maria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owners Insurance Company et al v. Midea America Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R Smith
Represented By: Amanda P Luedtke
Represented By: Richard E Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Amanda P Luedtke
Represented By: Richard E Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pinkert Law Firm, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pinkert Law Firm LLP
Represented By: Amanda P Luedtke
Represented By: Richard E Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midea America Corporation
Represented By: Maria DelPizzo Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEF Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company
Represented By: Maria DelPizzo Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEF Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?