BenShot LLC v. 2 Monkey Trading LLC et al
Plaintiff: BenShot LLC
Defendant: 2 Monkey Trading LLC and Lucky Shot USA LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01716
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 12 LETTER from Counsel regarding unpublished authorities . (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix, #3 Appendix, #4 Appendix)(Osmanski, John)
December 15, 2018 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BenShot LLC re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Osmanski, John)
November 28, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa A Spindler on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Melissa A. Spindler (Spindler, Melissa)
November 27, 2018 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE Statement by 2 Monkey Trading LLC. (Galster, Garet)
November 27, 2018 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE Statement by Lucky Shot USA LLC. (Galster, Garet)
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 BRIEF in Support filed by All Defendants re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Galster, Garet)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by All Defendants. (Galster, Garet)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BenShot LLC. Lucky Shot USA LLC served on 11/6/2018. (Osmanski, John)
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BenShot LLC. 2 Monkey Trading LLC served on 11/6/2018. (Osmanski, John)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by BenShot LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Osmanski, John)
October 30, 2018 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (cav)
October 30, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by BenShot LLC. (Osmanski, John)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by BenShot LLC. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2955973) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Civil Cover Sheet, #27 Summons, #28 Summons)(Osmanski, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BenShot LLC v. 2 Monkey Trading LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2 Monkey Trading LLC
Represented By: Melissa A Spindler
Represented By: Garet K Galster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucky Shot USA LLC
Represented By: Melissa A Spindler
Represented By: Garet K Galster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BenShot LLC
Represented By: John M Osmanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?