US Venture Inc v. United States of America

Plaintiff: US Venture Inc
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2018cv01757
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 12/21/2018 granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's responsive pleading is due 2/21/2019. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by United States of America. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Snyder, Hilarie)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Snyder, Hilarie)
November 29, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: United States of America answer deadline. (lh)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail by US Venture Inc served upon United States of America on 11-14-18 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified mail receipt from U.S. Attorney for the Eastern District of Wisconsin, #2 Exhibit Certified mail receipt from Commissioner of the Internal Revenue Service and USPS Tracking sheet, #3 Exhibit Certified mail receipt from Attorney General of the United States)(Smies, Jonathan)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by US Venture Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Smies, Jonathan)
November 7, 2018 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mac)
November 6, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by US Venture Inc. (Smies, Jonathan)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Refund of Federal Excise Taxes with Jury Demand; against United States of America by US Venture Inc. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2962454) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons As to Attorney General, #3 Summons As to IRS Commissioner, #4 Summons as to US Attorney)(Smies, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US Venture Inc v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Venture Inc
Represented By: Jonathan T Smies
Represented By: Shawn Robert O'Brien
Represented By: Maria Concheta Critelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Hilarie E Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?