Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan v. Buth et al
Plaintiff: Appvion, Inc. Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan and Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan
Defendant: Wendy Kaplan, Debra Fantini, Stephen Seifert, Kent Willetts, Paul J. Karch, Jane Doe Williams, Sydney Marzeotti, Louis A. Paone, ABC Corporation 1-5, Jane Doe Willetts, Arthur Driscoll, Michele Readon, Jeanne Richards, Patricia Suwyn, Lynn Socol, Kevin Gilligan, Gayle Buth, Jane Doe Carter, Timothy J Arent, Jane Doe Martin, Kelly Driscoll, Kerry Arent, Rick Fantini, DEF Partnerships 1-5, Reliance Trust Company, State Street Global Advisors/State Street Corporation, Rosemary Paone, Tom Ferree, Debrah Parker, Argent Trust Company, Thomas Scherbel, Jane Doe Murphy, Susan Scherbel, Stout Risius Ross, LLC, Scott D. Levine, Mark Suwyn, Angela Gilligan, Robert Socol, Dale Parker, Carol Feree, Teresa Pace, Anne Karch, Stephen Marzeotti, JKL Limited Liability Companies 1-5, Mark Richards, Ayelish M. McGarvey, GHI Limited Partnerships 1-5, David H. Williams, Houlihan Lokey Capital, Inc., Williamette Management Associates, Inc., State Street Bank & Trust Company, Andrew F. Readon, Ronald Pace, Angela Tyczkowski, Douglas Buth, Terry Murphy, John Doe Tyczkowski, Does 1 through 50, Aziz El-Tahch, Howard Kaplan, Kathi Seifert, Debora Levine, Stephen Carter, Stephen Martin, Debra L Fantini, David H Williams, Carol J Feree, Michele Reardon, Paul J Karch, Douglas P Buth, Timothy Arent, Andrew Reardon, Scott D Levine, Stout Risius Ross LLC, Willamette Management Associates,Inc, Houlihan Lokey Financial Advisors Inc, Houlihan Lokey Capital Inc, Louis Paone, Stout Risius Ross Advisors LLC and Ayelish M McGarvey
Case Number: 1:2018cv01861
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1109
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 TEXT ONLY ORDER APPROVING #84 Stipulation extending time to Answer or otherwise respond filed by Stout Risius Ross LLC, Kerry Arent; Timothy Arent, Argent Trust Company, Douglas P Buth, Gayle Buth, Jane Doe Carter, Stephen Carter, Arthur Driscoll, Kelly Driscoll, Aziz El-Tahch, Debra L Fantini, Rick Fantini, Carol J Feree, Tom Ferree, Angela Gilligan, Kevin Gilligan, Houlihan Lokey Capital Inc, Howard Kaplan, Wendy Kaplan, Anne Karch, Paul J Karc, Debora Levine, Scott D Levine, Jane Doe Martin, Stephen Martin, Stephen Marzeotti, Sydney Marzeotti, Ayelish M McGarvey, Jane Doe Murphy, Terry Murphy, Ronald Pace, Teresa Pace, Louis Paone, Rosemary Paone, Dale Parker, Debrah Parker, Andrew Reardon, Michele Reardon,, Reliance Trust Company, Jeanne Richards, Mark Richards, Susan Scherbel, Thomas Scherbel, Kathi Seifert, Stephen Seifert, Lynn Socol, Robert Socol, State Street Bank & Trust Company, Stout Risius, Ross Advisors LLC, Stout Risius Ross LLC, Mark Suwyn, Patricia Suwyn, Angela Tyczkowski, John Doe Tyczkowski, Willamette Management Associates,Inc, Jane Doe Willetts, Kent Willetts, David H Williams, and Jane Doe Williams answers are due 2/28/2019, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 01/24/2019. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
January 24, 2019 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank W Kowalkowski on behalf of Houlihan Lokey Capital Inc, Louis Paone, Rosemary Paone. Attorney(s) appearing: Frank W. Kowalkowski (Kowalkowski, Frank)
January 23, 2019 Filing 84 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation for Motion to Extend the Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Stout Risius Ross LLC. (Townsend, Ross)
January 18, 2019 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S Russell on behalf of Howard Kaplan, Wendy Kaplan, Jane Doe Martin, Stephen Martin, Reliance Trust Company, David H Williams, Jane Doe Williams. Attorney(s) appearing: Jeffrey S. Russell (Russell, Jeffrey)
January 17, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard R Winter on behalf of Willamette Management Associates,Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Richard R. Winter (Winter, Richard)
January 17, 2019 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara A Smith on behalf of Howard Kaplan, Wendy Kaplan, Jane Doe Martin, Stephen Martin, Reliance Trust Company, David H Williams, Jane Doe Williams. Attorney(s) appearing: Barbara A. Smith (Smith, Barbara)
January 10, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore M Becker on behalf of Houlihan Lokey Capital Inc, Louis Paone, Rosemary Paone. Attorney(s) appearing: Theodore M. Becker (Becker, Theodore)
January 10, 2019 Filing 79 DISCLOSURE Statement by Willamette Management Associates,Inc. (McCarthy, Chelsea)
January 9, 2019 Filing 78 STIPULATION to Substitute Counsel by Williamette Management Associates,Inc. (McCarthy, Chelsea)
January 8, 2019 Filing 77 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan.(Geenen, Sara)
January 4, 2019 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Gabrielle L Gould on behalf of State Street Bank & Trust Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Gabrielle L. Gould (Gould, Gabrielle)
December 28, 2018 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew L Riffee on behalf of State Street Bank & Trust Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew L. Riffee (Riffee, Matthew)
December 28, 2018 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by James O Fleckner on behalf of State Street Bank & Trust Company. Attorney(s) appearing: James O. Fleckner (Fleckner, James)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 TEXT ONLY ORDER Approving #72 Stipulation for extension of time to file responsive pleadings signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 12/27/2018. Williamette Management Associates' responsive pleadings are due on 1/28/2019. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
December 21, 2018 Filing 72 STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION FOR MOTION TO EXTEND THE TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS by Williamette Management Associates,Inc. (Breen, Patrick)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 TEXT ONLY ORDER Approving #63 , #65 Stipulations for extension of time to file responsive pleadings signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 12/21/2018. Responsive pleadings for these defendants are due on 1/28/2019. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
December 20, 2018 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick L Breen on behalf of Williamette Management Associates,Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Patrick L. Breen (Breen, Patrick)
December 20, 2018 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by T Wickham Schmidt on behalf of Kelly Driscoll, Stephen Marzeotti, Sydney Marzeotti, State Street Bank & Trust Company. Attorney(s) appearing: T. Wickham Schmidt (Schmidt, T)
December 20, 2018 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T Graham on behalf of Kerry Arent, Timothy Arent, Douglas P Buth, Gayle Buth, Jane Doe Carter, Stephen Carter, Debra L Fantini, Rick Fantini, Carol J Feree, Tom Ferree, Angela Gilligan, Kevin Gilligan, Anne Karch, Paul J Karch, Jane Doe Murphy, Terry Murphy, Ronald Pace, Teresa Pace, Dale Parker, Debrah Parker, Andrew Reardon, Michele Reardon, Jeanne Richards, Mark Richards, Susan Scherbel, Thomas Scherbel, Kathi Seifert, Stephen Seifert, Mark Suwyn, Patricia Suwyn, Angela Tyczkowski, John Doe Tyczkowski, Jane Doe Willetts, Kent Willetts. Attorney(s) appearing: Michael T. Graham (Graham, Michael)
December 19, 2018 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig C Martin on behalf of Kerry Arent, Timothy Arent, Douglas P Buth, Gayle Buth, Jane Doe Carter, Stephen Carter, Debra L Fantini, Rick Fantini, Carol J Feree, Tom Ferree, Angela Gilligan, Kevin Gilligan, Anne Karch, Paul J Karch, Jane Doe Murphy, Terry Murphy, Ronald Pace, Teresa Pace, Dale Parker, Debrah Parker, Andrew Reardon, Michele Reardon, Jeanne Richards, Mark Richards, Susan Scherbel, Thomas Scherbel, Kathi Seifert, Stephen Seifert, Mark Suwyn, Patricia Suwyn, Angela Tyczkowski, John Doe Tyczkowski, Jane Doe Willetts, Kent Willetts. Attorney(s) appearing: Craig C. Martin (Martin, Craig)
December 19, 2018 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Sherry D Coley on behalf of Howard Kaplan, Wendy Kaplan, Jane Doe Martin, Stephen Martin, Reliance Trust Company, David H Williams, Jane Doe Williams. Attorney(s) appearing: Sherry D. Coley (Coley, Sherry)
December 19, 2018 Filing 65 STIPULATION Joint for Motion to Extend the Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. (Geenen, Sara)
December 19, 2018 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Lars C Golumbic on behalf of Aziz El-Tahch, Debora Levine, Scott D Levine, Ayelish M McGarvey, Lynn Socol, Robert Socol, Stout Risius Ross LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Lars C. Golumbic (Golumbic, Lars)
December 19, 2018 Filing 63 STIPULATION Joint for Motion to Extend the Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. (Geenen, Sara)
December 19, 2018 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Ross Townsend on behalf of Aziz El-Tahch, Debora Levine, Scott D Levine, Ayelish M McGarvey, Lynn Socol, Robert Socol, Stout Risius Ross LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Ross W. Townsend (Townsend, Ross)
December 10, 2018 Filing 61 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Rosemary Paone served on 12/5/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
December 10, 2018 Filing 60 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Louis Paone served on 12/5/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
December 10, 2018 Filing 59 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Terry Murphy served on 11/29/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
December 10, 2018 Filing 58 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Michele Reardon served on 11/28/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
December 10, 2018 Filing 57 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Andrew Reardon served on 11/28/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
December 10, 2018 Filing 56 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Mark Suwyn served on 11/28/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
December 10, 2018 Filing 55 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Patricia Suwyn served on 11/28/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
December 10, 2018 Filing 54 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Angela Tyczkowski served on 12/5/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
December 10, 2018 Filing 53 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Debora Levine served on 11/29/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
December 10, 2018 Filing 52 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Scott D Levine served on 11/29/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
December 10, 2018 Filing 51 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Houlihan Lokey Capital Inc served on 11/30/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
December 10, 2018 Filing 50 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Jane Doe Willetts served on 12/10/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
December 10, 2018 Filing 49 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Kent Willetts served on 12/3/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
December 10, 2018 Filing 48 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Paul J Karch served on 12/2/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
December 10, 2018 Filing 47 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Anne Karch served on 12/2/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
December 10, 2018 Filing 46 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Kelly Driscoll served on 12/10/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
December 6, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Williams Hale on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Ashley Williams Hale (Hale, Ashley)
December 6, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Lowell Richard Williams on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: L. Richard Williams (Williams, Lowell)
December 6, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Abigail M Terhune on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Abigail M. Terhune (Terhune, Abigail)
December 6, 2018 Summons Issued as to Arthur Driscoll, Kelly Driscoll. (lh)
December 6, 2018 Filing 42 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan (Geenen, Sara)
December 5, 2018 Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Howard Kaplan served on 12/1/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
December 5, 2018 Filing 40 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Wendy Kaplan served on 12/1/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
December 5, 2018 Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Stephen Seifert served on 11/28/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
December 5, 2018 Filing 38 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Kathi Seifert served on 11/29/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
December 5, 2018 Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Kerry Arent served on 11/28/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
December 5, 2018 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Timothy Arent served on 11/28/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
December 5, 2018 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Douglas P Buth served on 11/28/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
December 5, 2018 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Gayle Buth served on 11/28/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
December 5, 2018 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Kevin Gilligan served on 11/28/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
December 5, 2018 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Angela Gilligan served on 11/28/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
December 5, 2018 Filing 31 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan as to Teresa Pace. (Geenen, Sara)
December 5, 2018 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Ronald Pace served on 11/28/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
December 5, 2018 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Williamette Management Associates,Inc served on 11/29/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
December 5, 2018 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Dale Parker served on 11/29/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
December 5, 2018 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Debrah Parker served on 11/29/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
December 5, 2018 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Carol J Feree served on 11/29/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
December 5, 2018 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Tom Ferree served on 11/29/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
December 5, 2018 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Rick Fantini served on 11/29/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
December 5, 2018 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Debra L Fantini served on 11/29/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
December 5, 2018 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Robert Socol served on 12/1/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
December 5, 2018 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Lynn Socol served on 12/1/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
December 5, 2018 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Thomas Scherbel served on 11/29/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
December 5, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Susan Scherbel served on 11/29/18(Geenen, Sara) Modified on 12/6/2018 to note party served (lh).
December 5, 2018 Filing 18 RE-DOCKETED AS #19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Susan Scherbel served on 11/29/2018. (Geenen, Sara) Modified on 12/6/2018 (cms)
December 5, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Stephen Carter served on 11/28/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
December 3, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Argent Trust Company served on 11/28/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
November 30, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Stephen Martin served on 11/29/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
November 30, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Jane Doe Martin served on 11/29/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
November 30, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. State Street Bank & Trust Company served on 11/29/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
November 30, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. State Street Global Advisors/State Street Corporation served on 11/29/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
November 30, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Kelly Driscoll served on 11/29/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
November 30, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Arthur Driscoll served on 11/29/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
November 30, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Stephen Marzeotti served on 11/30/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
November 30, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Sydney Marzeotti served on 11/30/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
November 29, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Reliance Trust Company served on 11/29/2018. (Geenen, Sara)
November 28, 2018 Summons Issued as to Robert and Lynn Socol and Stephen and Joan Kula. (cav)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Geenen, Sara)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Geenen, Sara)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Geenen, Sara)
November 27, 2018 Summons Issued as to Kerry Arent, Timothy Arent, Argent Trust Company, Douglas P Buth, Gayle Buth, Jane Doe Carter, Stephen Carter, Arthur Driscoll, Kelly Driscoll, Aziz El-Tahch, Debra L Fantini, Rick Fantini, Carol J Feree, Tom Ferree, Angela Gilligan, Kevin Gilligan, Houlihan Lokey Capital Inc, Howard Kaplan, Wendy Kaplan, Anne Karch, Paul J Karch, Debora Levine, Scott D Levine, Jane Doe Martin, Stephen Martin, Stephen Marzeotti, Sydney Marzeotti, Ayelish M McGarvey, Jane Doe Murphy, Terry Murphy, Ronald Pace, Teresa Pace, Louis Paone, Rosemary Paone, Dale Parker, Debrah Parker, Michele Reardon, Andrew Reardon, Reliance Trust Company, Jeanne Richards, Mark Richards, Susan Scherbel, Thomas Scherbel, Kathi Seifert, Stephen Seifert, State Street Bank & Trust Company, State Street Global Advisors/State Street Corporation, Stout Risius Ross Advisors LLC, Stout Risius Ross LLC, Mark Suwyn, Patricia Suwyn, Angela Tyczkowski, John Doe Tyczkowski, Jane Doe Willetts, Kent Willetts, Williamette Management Associates,Inc, David H Williams, Jane Doe Williams. (lh)
November 27, 2018 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #1 Complaint filed by Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan ; All documents should contain the s/signature of the attorney who files the document. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (lh)
November 27, 2018 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (lh)
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs Revised to add Jane Doe Williams (Geenen, Sara)
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs Amended to add Jane Doe Willetts (Geenen, Sara)
November 27, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Appvion, Inc. Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2976216) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment, #3 Summons Buth, #4 Summons Karch, #5 Summons Richards, #6 Summons Ferree, #7 Summons Fantini, #8 Summons Parker, #9 Summons Tyczkowski, #10 Summons Arent, #11 Summons Willetts, #12 Summons Scherbel, #13 Summons Pace, #14 Summons Carter, #15 Summons Seifert, #16 Summons Reardon, #17 Summons Murphy, #18 Summons Suwyn, #19 Summons Gilligan, #20 Summons Paone, #21 Summons Houlihan Lokey Capital, Inc., #22 Summons State Street Bank and Trust, #23 Summons State Street Global Advisors, #24 Summons Driscoll, #25 Summons Marzeotti, #26 Summons Argent Trust Company, #27 Summons Reliance Trust Company, #28 Summons Kaplan, #29 Summons Martin, #30 Summons Williams, #31 Summons Willamette Management Associates, #32 Summons Levine, #33 Summons El-Tahch/McGarvey, #34 Summons Stout Risius Ross Advisors, #35 Summons Stout Risius Ross, LLC)(Geenen, Sara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan v. Buth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kaplan
Represented By: Sherry D Coley
Represented By: Barbara A Smith
Represented By: Jeffrey S Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Fantini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Seifert
Represented By: Craig C Martin
Represented By: Michael T Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent Willetts
Represented By: Craig C Martin
Represented By: Michael T Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul J. Karch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Williams
Represented By: Sherry D Coley
Represented By: Barbara A Smith
Represented By: Jeffrey S Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sydney Marzeotti
Represented By: T Wickham Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis A. Paone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporation 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Willetts
Represented By: Craig C Martin
Represented By: Michael T Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Readon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne Richards
Represented By: Craig C Martin
Represented By: Michael T Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Suwyn
Represented By: Craig C Martin
Represented By: Michael T Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Socol
Represented By: Ross Townsend
Represented By: Lars C Golumbic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Gilligan
Represented By: Craig C Martin
Represented By: Michael T Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gayle Buth
Represented By: Craig C Martin
Represented By: Michael T Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Carter
Represented By: Craig C Martin
Represented By: Michael T Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy J Arent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Martin
Represented By: Sherry D Coley
Represented By: Barbara A Smith
Represented By: Jeffrey S Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Driscoll
Represented By: T Wickham Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerry Arent
Represented By: Craig C Martin
Represented By: Michael T Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Fantini
Represented By: Craig C Martin
Represented By: Michael T Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEF Partnerships 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Trust Company
Represented By: Sherry D Coley
Represented By: Barbara A Smith
Represented By: Jeffrey S Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Street Global Advisors/State Street Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosemary Paone
Represented By: Theodore M Becker
Represented By: Frank W Kowalkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Ferree
Represented By: Craig C Martin
Represented By: Michael T Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debrah Parker
Represented By: Craig C Martin
Represented By: Michael T Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Argent Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Scherbel
Represented By: Craig C Martin
Represented By: Michael T Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Murphy
Represented By: Craig C Martin
Represented By: Michael T Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Scherbel
Represented By: Craig C Martin
Represented By: Michael T Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stout Risius Ross, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott D. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Suwyn
Represented By: Craig C Martin
Represented By: Michael T Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Gilligan
Represented By: Craig C Martin
Represented By: Michael T Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Socol
Represented By: Ross Townsend
Represented By: Lars C Golumbic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Parker
Represented By: Craig C Martin
Represented By: Michael T Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Feree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Pace
Represented By: Craig C Martin
Represented By: Michael T Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Karch
Represented By: Craig C Martin
Represented By: Michael T Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Marzeotti
Represented By: T Wickham Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JKL Limited Liability Companies 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Richards
Represented By: Craig C Martin
Represented By: Michael T Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ayelish M. McGarvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GHI Limited Partnerships 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David H. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houlihan Lokey Capital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williamette Management Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Street Bank & Trust Company
Represented By: James O Fleckner
Represented By: Gabrielle L Gould
Represented By: Matthew L Riffee
Represented By: T Wickham Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew F. Readon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Pace
Represented By: Craig C Martin
Represented By: Michael T Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Tyczkowski
Represented By: Craig C Martin
Represented By: Michael T Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Buth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Murphy
Represented By: Craig C Martin
Represented By: Michael T Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Tyczkowski
Represented By: Craig C Martin
Represented By: Michael T Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aziz El-Tahch
Represented By: Ross Townsend
Represented By: Lars C Golumbic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Kaplan
Represented By: Sherry D Coley
Represented By: Barbara A Smith
Represented By: Jeffrey S Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathi Seifert
Represented By: Craig C Martin
Represented By: Michael T Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debora Levine
Represented By: Ross Townsend
Represented By: Lars C Golumbic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Carter
Represented By: Craig C Martin
Represented By: Michael T Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Martin
Represented By: Sherry D Coley
Represented By: Barbara A Smith
Represented By: Jeffrey S Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra L Fantini
Represented By: Craig C Martin
Represented By: Michael T Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David H Williams
Represented By: Sherry D Coley
Represented By: Barbara A Smith
Represented By: Jeffrey S Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol J Feree
Represented By: Craig C Martin
Represented By: Michael T Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Reardon
Represented By: Craig C Martin
Represented By: Michael T Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul J Karch
Represented By: Craig C Martin
Represented By: Michael T Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas P Buth
Represented By: Craig C Martin
Represented By: Michael T Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Arent
Represented By: Craig C Martin
Represented By: Michael T Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Reardon
Represented By: Craig C Martin
Represented By: Michael T Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott D Levine
Represented By: Ross Townsend
Represented By: Lars C Golumbic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stout Risius Ross LLC
Represented By: Ross Townsend
Represented By: Lars C Golumbic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willamette Management Associates,Inc
Represented By: Patrick L Breen
Represented By: Richard R Winter
Represented By: Chelsea Ashbrook McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houlihan Lokey Financial Advisors Inc
Represented By: Frank W Kowalkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houlihan Lokey Capital Inc
Represented By: Theodore M Becker
Represented By: Frank W Kowalkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Paone
Represented By: Theodore M Becker
Represented By: Frank W Kowalkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stout Risius Ross Advisors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ayelish M McGarvey
Represented By: Ross Townsend
Represented By: Lars C Golumbic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Appvion, Inc. Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan
Represented By: Sara J Geenen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Appvion Inc Retirement Savings and Employee Stock Ownership Plan
Represented By: Sara J Geenen
Represented By: Ashley Williams Hale
Represented By: Lowell Richard Williams
Represented By: Frederick Perillo
Represented By: Abigail M Terhune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?