Renaud v. ABC Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: POA for E Williams Kim Renaud and Kim Renaud
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company and Walmart Inc
Undetermined: Alex M Azar, II and UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv01876
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #12 Disclosure Statement filed by Walmart Inc ; Electronically filed documents should not be scanned whenever possible. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (lh)
January 9, 2019 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE Statement by Walmart Inc. (Andrews, Eric)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 1/4/2019. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
January 4, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William C Griesbach: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 1/4/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 2/15/2019, Discovery due by 1/14/2020, Plaintiffs Expert Witness List due by 6/3/2019, Defendants Expert Witness List due by 9/2/2019, Motions due by 1/14/2020, Rule 26(a) Disclosures to be exchanged by 1/16/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/17/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 201, 125 S. Jefferson St., Green Bay, WI 54301 before Chief Judge William C Griesbach., Jury Trial set for 5/4/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 201, 125 S. Jefferson St., Green Bay, WI 54301 before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. (Tape #010419) (mac)
January 2, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric L Andrews on behalf of Walmart Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Eric L. Andrews (Andrews, Eric)
January 2, 2019 Filing 8 DUPLICATE FILING. NOTICE of Appearance by Eric L Andrews on behalf of Walmart Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Eric L. Andrews (Andrews, Eric) Modified on 1/3/2019 (mac).
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand to Subrogated Defendant's Crossclaim by Walmart Inc.(Pastrana, Carlos)
December 16, 2018 Filing 6 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Walmart Inc. (Pastrana, Carlos)
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Kim Renaud. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Koch, Joshua)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by Kim Renaud. (Koch, Joshua)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Walmart Inc.(Pastrana, Carlos)
November 30, 2018 DISREGARD - FILED IN WRONG CASE. Transmit #5 Amended Complaint and Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF (mac)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 1/4/2019 at 09:20 AM before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. The court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be re-scheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov (cc: all counsel)(mac)
November 29, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Inc from Marinette County, Case Number: 2018cv000222 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2978826) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Summons, #4 Complaint)(Pastrana, Carlos) (Attachment 4 replaced on 12/4/2018 with complete document) (mac). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/4/2018: #5 United Healthcare Ins. Co. Answer & Counterclaim) (mac).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Renaud v. ABC Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Alex M Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew S Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: POA for E Williams Kim Renaud
Represented By: Joshua M Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Renaud
Represented By: Joshua M Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Represented By: Carlos R Pastrana
Represented By: Eric L Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?