Isaac v. Ochoa

Petitioner: Osei Isaac
Respondent: Y Ochoa
Case Number: 1:2018cv01993
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk and approved by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 1/23/2019. (cc: all counsel)(mac)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 1/23/2019 denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. This case is DISMISSED as moot. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
December 27, 2018 Mail Sent to Osei Isaac at Kenosha County Detention Center Returned as Undeliverable not in custody re #3 Letter from Clerk re Consent to Magistrate. Could not locate petitioner. (cms)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to petitioner re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Duffin and the trust account statement both to be filed within 21 days. Mailed to petitioner. (cms)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Osei Isaac. (cms)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Osei Isaac. (cms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Isaac v. Ochoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Y Ochoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Osei Isaac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?