United States of America v. Delchambre

Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Travis Delchambre
Case Number: 1:2018mc00064
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Travis Delchambre; respondent served on 12/6/2018. (tlf)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 TRANSMIT #1 Petition and #2 Order to USMS for service on Respondent Travis Delchambre. (tlf)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 11/26/2018. Show Cause Hearing set for 2/1/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 201, 125 S. Jefferson St., Green Bay, WI 54301 before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. The US Marshal Service is directed to effect personal service on Respondent Travis Delchambre within 30 days of the date of this order. Show Cause Response is due from the Respondent within 21 days of service of this order, the petition, and exhibits. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
November 19, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach (jcl)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION To Enforce Internal Revenue Service Summons filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Megan Salazar, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 -Summons, #4 Exhibit 4 - IRS Letter, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Flaherty, Maura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Delchambre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Maura S Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Travis Delchambre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?