Redman-Zank v. Wisconsin Department of Corrections et al

Plaintiff: Jean Redman-Zank
Defendant: Wisconsin Department of Corrections and Nikolaus Werner
Case Number: 1:2019cv00057
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Substitution by Gesina S Carson on behalf of Nikolaus Werner, Wisconsin Department of Corrections. Additional Attorney(s) appearing: Gesina S. Carson; Attorney Anne M. Bensky to be termed. (Carson, Gesina)
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Nikolaus Werner, Wisconsin Department of Corrections. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Bensky, Anne)
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne M Bensky on behalf of Nikolaus Werner, Wisconsin Department of Corrections. Attorney(s) appearing: Anne M. Bensky (Bensky, Anne)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel L Bachhuber on behalf of Nikolaus Werner, Wisconsin Department of Corrections. Attorney(s) appearing: Rachel L. Bachhuber (Bachhuber, Rachel)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wisconsin Department of Corrections - Waiver sent on 1/22/2019. (Kennelly, Mary)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nikolaus Werner - Waiver sent on 2/5/2019. (Kennelly, Mary)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Kennelly, Mary)
January 10, 2019 Summons Issued as to Nikolaus Werner, Wisconsin Department of Corrections. (lh)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Kennelly, Mary)
January 9, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Jean Redman-Zank. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-3006921) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Right to Sue Notice, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Department of Corrections, #4 Summons Nikolaus Werner)(Kennelly, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redman-Zank v. Wisconsin Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin Department of Corrections
Represented By: Gesina S Carson
Represented By: Rachel L Bachhuber
Represented By: Anne M Bensky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikolaus Werner
Represented By: Gesina S Carson
Represented By: Rachel L Bachhuber
Represented By: Anne M Bensky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Redman-Zank
Represented By: Mary E Kennelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?