Australian Supplements Pty Ltd v. Landen et al
Plaintiff: Australian Supplements Pty Ltd
Defendant: Shelly Kay Landen, 123 Diet USA, LLC and 123 Diet USA LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00091
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 3/1/2019 Approving #7 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Response to Complaint to March 15, 2019. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Australian Supplements Pty Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint)(Zimmer, Paul)
February 25, 2019 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #6 Certificate of Service filed by Australian Supplements Pty Ltd, #5 Certificate of Service filed by Australian Supplements Pty Ltd ; The incorrect event was chosen; There is no need to re-file, the entry has been modified. Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (lh)
February 25, 2019 Set Answer Date for 123 Diet USA LLC and Shelly Kay Landen. (lh)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed by Australian Supplements Pty Ltd Shelly Kay Landen, individually, served on 2/8/19 (Zimmer, Paul) Modified event and text on 2/25/2019 (lh).
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed by Australian Supplements Pty Ltd Shelly Kay Landen served on behalf of 123 Diet USA, LLC on 2/8/19 (Zimmer, Paul) Modified event and text on 2/25/2019 (lh).
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Australian Supplements Pty Ltd. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Zimmer, Paul)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Grant C Killoran on behalf of Australian Supplements Pty Ltd. Attorney(s) appearing: Grant C. Killoran (Killoran, Grant)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Australian Supplements Pty Ltd. (Zimmer, Paul)
January 17, 2019 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #1 Complaint, filed by Australian Supplements Pty Ltd ; Attachments to documents should be clearly described. This document does not need to be re-filed. Please refer to the Judge Griesbach's Instructions for Litigants found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (lh)
January 17, 2019 Summons Issued as to 123 Diet USA LLC, Shelly Kay Landen. (lh)
January 16, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Shelly Kay Landen and 123 Diet USA LLC Australian Supplements Pty Ltd by Australian Supplements Pty Ltd. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-3011971) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Zimmer, Paul) Modified on 1/16/2019 (mlm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/16/2019: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Australian Supplements Pty Ltd v. Landen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelly Kay Landen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 123 Diet USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 123 Diet USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Australian Supplements Pty Ltd
Represented By: Paul W Zimmer
Represented By: Grant C Killoran
Represented By: Robert R Gagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?