Owners Insurance Company et al v. Electrolux Home Products, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Owners Insurance Company, Pinkert Law Firm, LLP, James R Smith and Pinkert Law Firm LLP
Defendant: DEF Corporation, Electrolux Home Products, Inc., ABC Insurance Company, ABC Corporation, DEF Insurance Company and Electrolux Home Products Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv00339
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
April 24, 2019 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William C Griesbach: Scheduling Conference held on 4/24/2019, Initial Disclosures due by 4/30/2019, Discovery due by 3/2/2020, Plaintiffs Expert Witness List due by 8/1/2019, Defendants Expert Witness List due by 11/1/2019, Motions due by 1/31/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/5/2020 01:30 PM before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. Jury Trial set for 6/22/2020 08:30 AM before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. (Tape #042419) (cav)
April 12, 2019 NOTICE of RESCHEDULED Hearing: (cc: all counsel) Scheduling Conference previously set for 4/19/2019 is RESCHEDULED to 4/24/2019 09:30 AM By Telephone before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. (cav)
April 3, 2019 Filing 8 Joint Initial REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by All Defendants. (Sanders, Maria)
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Electrolux Home Products Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Sanders, Maria)
March 14, 2019 NOTICE of RESCHEDULED Hearing: (cc: all counsel)RULE 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 4/4/2019 is RESCHEDULED to 4/19/2019 03:30 PM in By Telephone before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. (cav)
March 13, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER from Attorney Maria D. Sanders re: Rescheduling Rule 16(b) Telephone Scheduling Conference. (Sanders, Maria)
March 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 4/4/2019 09:40 AM in before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. Rule 26(f) Report due 3/28/2019. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
March 12, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Electrolux Home Products Inc.(Sanders, Maria)
March 7, 2019 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Electrolux Home Products Inc ; The description of the attachments contains duplicate text. In the future, when attaching documents to the main document you may select a description from the category drop-down list but then you should not repeat that word in the description text box. For example, if you choose Exhibit from the drop-down list, then you may simply type A in the description text box and Exhibit A will appear on the docket. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (lh)
March 7, 2019 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (lh)
March 6, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Sanders, Maria)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Electrolux Home Products, Inc. Adverse Party Notice of Filing of Removal to U.S. District Court Eastern District of Wisconsin, Green Bay Division (Sanders, Maria)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Electrolux Home Products, Inc. from Door County Circuit Court, Case Number: 19CV00005 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-3047470) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Ex B to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Ex C to Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit Ex D to Notice of Removal)(Sanders, Maria) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/6/2019: #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl). (Attachment 5 replaced on 3/7/2019) (lh). (Attachment 4 replaced on 3/12/2019 at counsel request to remove personal identifies) (lh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owners Insurance Company et al v. Electrolux Home Products, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEF Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Represented By: Maria DelPizzo Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEF Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products Inc
Represented By: Maria DelPizzo Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Nicholas J DeStefanis
Represented By: Richard E Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pinkert Law Firm, LLP
Represented By: Nicholas J DeStefanis
Represented By: Richard E Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R Smith
Represented By: Nicholas J DeStefanis
Represented By: Richard E Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pinkert Law Firm LLP
Represented By: Nicholas J DeStefanis
Represented By: Richard E Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?