Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company v. Munao et al

Plaintiff: Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company
Defendant: Gena M. Fisco, Louis Andrew Munao, Jr., Jennifer Graham Munao, Louis Andrew Munao, Jr and Gena M Fisco
Case Number: 1:2019cv00698
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie F Wall on behalf of Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Julie F. Wall (Wall, Julie)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Substitution by Jennifer S Stegmaier on behalf of Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. Attorney Jennifer S. Stegmaier to be termed. (Stegmaier, Jennifer)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jennifer Graham Munao - Waiver sent on 5/14/2019. (Stegmaier, Jennifer)
May 23, 2019 Interpleader Deposit Received (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) in the amount of $251,639.59 (lh)
May 23, 2019 Receipt of $251,639.59, Receipt no. GB4689005448. Deposited by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company into the Registry Fund of this Court re: Policy Number 8181822-MUNAO (Face Amount $250,000.00, Refund of Premium $30.00, Taxable Interest $1,609.59 -Interest at 2.5% from 2/19/19 to 5/24/19) (lh) Modified text on 5/23/2019 (lh).
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Deposit. (cc: all counsel and financial) (Griesbach, William)
May 14, 2019 Summons Issued as to Gena M Fisco, Jennifer Graham Munao, Louis Andrew Munao, Jr. (lh)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Deposit its Admitted Liability by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stegmaier, Jennifer)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. (Stegmaier, Jennifer)
May 13, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by William A Chittenden, III on behalf of Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: William A. Chittenden, III (Chittenden, William)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Interpleader against Gena M. Fisco, Jennifer Graham Munao, Louis Andrew Munao, Jr. by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3108108) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 6, #2 Summons (Jennifer Graham Munao), #3 Summons (Louis Andrew Munao, Jr.), #4 Summons (Gena M. Fisco), #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stegmaier, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company v. Munao et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gena M. Fisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Andrew Munao, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Graham Munao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Andrew Munao, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gena M Fisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer S Stegmaier
Represented By: William A Chittenden, III
Represented By: Julie F Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?