Katz et al v. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth H. Katz and Kenneth H Katz
Defendant: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company and ABC Insurance Company
Not Yet Classified: Forefront Dermatology, S.C. and Forefront Dermatology SC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00864
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Case Administratively Closed, SEE #7 Order. (lh)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER APPROVING #6 Stipulation to Stay and Administratively Close Case for a period of six months, filed by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 07/15/2019. Within 30 days of a final adverse determination, counsel for Plaintiff Katz shall notify the Court and the case will return to active status. However, absent further order of the Court or request by the parties within the next six months, the case will be dismissed. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAIL. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION for stay of litigation pending exhaustion of administrative remedies by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order re Stay of Litigation)(Hittler, William)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ORDER APPROVING #3 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 6/25/2019. Answer or other responsive pleading due 7/8/2019. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Hittler, William)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hittler, William)
June 12, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Tony Bombassi (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hittler, William)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company from Manitowoc County, Case Number: 2019CV000214 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3135401) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Hittler, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Katz et al v. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth H. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth H Katz
Represented By: Kevin P Stangel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Represented By: William D Hittler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Forefront Dermatology, S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Forefront Dermatology SC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?