Winius, Michael v. Pawlak, Kristen et al
Plaintiff: Michael Winius
Defendant: Kristen L. Pawlak, Steven Johnson, Captain Thomas Wiegan, Lisa Buhs, Jon E Litscher, Paul Kemper, Mark Heise and Robin Diebold
Case Number: 1:2019cv00936
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Green Bay Office
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Updated Change of Address as to Michael Winius to Prairie du Chien Correctional Institution. Mr. Winius will have a new address of 1617 Main Avenue, Kaukauna, WI 54130 effective 9/17/2019. (mac)
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 SCREENING ORDER (cc: all counsel and via US Mail to Michael Winius and Warden)(Griesbach, William)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Michael T. Winus with CD enclosed. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter)(lh)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Western; Case Number 3:19-cv-00160. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #4 Motion to Remand to State Court; granting #2 Motion to Transfer to Eastern District of Wisconsin. This case is TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court of the Eastern District of Wisconsin under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/26/2019. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/27/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 Combined Brief in Reply to #4 Motion to Remand to State Court, by Michael Winius and Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Michael Winius re: #2 Motion to Transfer, filed by Thomas Wiegan, Lisa Buhs, Steven Johnson, Kristen L. Pawlak, Robin Diebold, Jon E. Litscher, Mark Heise, Paul Kemper. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter and Envelope) (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/27/2019.]
April 2, 2019 Filing 7 Brief in Opposition by Defendants Lisa Buhs, Robin Diebold, Mark Heise, Steven Johnson, Paul Kemper, Jon E. Litscher, Kristen L. Pawlak, Thomas Wiegan re: #4 Motion to Remand to State Court and Brief in Reply in Support of #2 Motion to Transfer to Eastern District of Wisconsin. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Paulson, Rebecca),(ps) Modified on 4/2/2019 (nln). [Transferred from wiwd on 6/27/2019.]
March 20, 2019 Filing 6 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Michael Winius re: #2 Motion to Transfer. (rks),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/27/2019.]
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 Affidavit of Michael T. Winius filed by Plaintiff Michael Winius re: #4 Motion to Remand and Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Notice of Removal to The United States District Court. (rks),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/27/2019.]
March 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION TO REMAND and Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Notice of Removal to The United States District Court by Plaintiff Michael Winius. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-15 - Various documents related to Dane Co. Case No. 2018CV003054 (18-IP-0043), #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Envelope) (rks),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/27/2019.]
March 20, 2019 Set Briefing Deadlines as to #4 MOTION TO REMAND and Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Notice of Removal to The United States District Court. Defendants' Brief in Opposition due 4/3/2019. Plaintiff's Brief in Reply due 4/15/2019. (rks),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/27/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 Record from Circuit Court of Dane County. (Attachments: #1 Docket sheet) (jef),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/21/2019: #2 Dane County Case 18CV3054 Record) (rks). [Transferred from wiwd on 6/27/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION TO TRANSFER to Eastern District of Wisconsin by Defendants Lisa Buhs, Robin Diebold, Mark Heise, Steven Johnson, Paul Kemper, Jon E. Litscher, Kristen L. Pawlak, Thomas Wiegan. (Attachments: #1 Judicial Caseload Profile, #2 Certificate of Service) (Paulson, Rebecca),(ps) Modified on 3/1/2019: Missing paragraph 5. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/27/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Judge update in case. Case randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb. (rks),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/27/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Prisoner Litigation Reform Act Screening. (rks),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/27/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #2 MOTION TO TRANSFER to Eastern District of Wisconsin . Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition due 3/14/2019. Defendants' Brief in Reply due 3/21/2019. (rks),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/27/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dane County Circuit Court, case number 18CV3054, ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0758-2417296), filed by Paul Kemper, Kristen Pawlak, Mark Heise, Jon E. Litscher, Robin Diebold, Lisa Buhs, Thomas Wiegan, Steven Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Summons and Complaint and Exhibits, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service) (Paulson, Rebecca),(ps) Modified on 2/28/2019. (lak) Modified on 2/28/2019 (jef). [Transferred from wiwd on 6/27/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winius, Michael v. Pawlak, Kristen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristen L. Pawlak
Represented By: Rebecca A Paulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Johnson
Represented By: Rebecca A Paulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Thomas Wiegan
Represented By: Rebecca A Paulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Buhs
Represented By: Rebecca A Paulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon E Litscher
Represented By: Rebecca A Paulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Kemper
Represented By: Rebecca A Paulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Heise
Represented By: Rebecca A Paulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Diebold
Represented By: Rebecca A Paulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Winius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?