Eckstein v. St Paul Elder Services Inc
Plaintiff: Alicia Eckstein
Defendant: St. Paul Elder Services, Inc. and St Paul Elder Services Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv00945
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: (cc: all counsel)RULE 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/2019 09:00 AM in By Telephone before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. The court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov(lh)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany Lopez Naleid on behalf of St Paul Elder Services Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Brittany Lopez Naleid (Naleid, Brittany)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher K Schuele on behalf of St Paul Elder Services Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Christopher K. Schuele (Schuele, Christopher)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE Statement by St Paul Elder Services Inc. (Sholl, Robert)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by St Paul Elder Services Inc.(Sholl, Robert)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by St Paul Elder Services Inc - Waiver sent on 6/28/2019. (Luzi, Scott)
July 1, 2019 Summons Issued as to St Paul Elder Services Inc. (mac)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Alicia Eckstein. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Luzi, Scott)
June 28, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott S Luzi on behalf of Alicia Eckstein. Attorney(s) appearing: Scott S. Luzi (Luzi, Scott)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Alicia Eckstein. (Luzi, Scott)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against St. Paul Elder Services, Inc. by Alicia Eckstein. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3149846) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Summons, #3 Eckstein Consent to Join Form)(Luzi, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eckstein v. St Paul Elder Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Elder Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Paul Elder Services Inc
Represented By: Brittany Lopez Naleid
Represented By: Robert K Sholl
Represented By: Christopher K Schuele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Eckstein
Represented By: Scott S Luzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?