Broehm v. Saul
Plaintiff: Randy J Broehm
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv01186
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; US Attorney General served on 8/27/2019. (mac)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to the parties: Plaintiffs brief due 12/9/2019; Defendants response due 1/16/2020; Plaintiffs reply due 1/31/2020. (cc: all counsel) (mac)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/27/2019. (mac)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Andrew M Saul. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 8/20819 granting #3 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the Commissioner of Social Security. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
August 20, 2019 Transmit Complaint and Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF (lh)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Randy J Broehm. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Schultz, Barry)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Randy J Broehm. (Schultz, Barry)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Randy J Broehm. (Schultz, Barry)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Randy J Broehm (Attachments: #1 AC decision, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schultz, Barry)
August 16, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach. Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website. (ds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broehm v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy J Broehm
Represented By: Barry A Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?