Kramer v. Saul
Plaintiff: Jonathon Michael Kramer
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration and Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv01558
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Skutch Cohn on behalf of Andrew M Saul. Attorney(s) appearing: Emily S. Cohn (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cohn, Emily)
November 8, 2019 Filing 9 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to the parties: Plaintiffs brief due 2/18/2020; Defendants response due 3/27/2020; Plaintiffs reply due 4/13/2020. (cc: all counsel, via US Mail to Kramer) (mac)
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; US Attorney General served on 11/5/2019. (mac)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Andrew M Saul. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Jonathon Michael Kramer. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (cms)
October 30, 2019 Transmit Complaint and Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF (mac)
October 29, 2019 Copies of #4 Temporary Order and Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee, #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Jonathon Michael Kramer. (Sickel, James)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee, signed by Magistrate Judge James R Sickel on 10/29/2019. The clerk shall serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the Commissioner of Social Security. (cc: all counsel) (Sickel, James)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEMPORARY ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge James R Sickel signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 10/16/19. (cc: all counsel)(lh)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (blr)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Jonathon Michael Kramer. (blr)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Jonathon Michael Kramer. Consent forms distributed to the parties for Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin. (Attachments: #1 Social Security Decisions/Documentation)(blr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kramer v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Represented By: Emily Skutch Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathon Michael Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?