Houle et al v. The Bank of New York Mellon
Plaintiff: Joseph Houle and Nicole Houle
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation and The Bank of New York Mellon
Case Number: 1:2019cv01628
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 12/10/2019. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
December 9, 2019 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William C Griesbach: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 12/9/2019. Discovery due by 5/15/2020, Plaintiffs Expert Witness List due by 2/14/2020, Defendants Expert Witness List due by 3/16/2020, Motions due by 6/15/2020, Rule 26(a) Disclosures to be exchanged by 12/13/2019. (Tape #120919) (mac)
December 2, 2019 NOTICE of RESCHEDULED Hearing: (cc: all counsel)RULE 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 12/6/2019 is RESCHEDULED to 12/9/2019 11:30 AM in By Telephone before Judge William C Griesbach. The court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be re-scheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov (cav)
November 20, 2019 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE Statement by The Bank of New York Mellon. (Haywood, Taylor)
November 20, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by The Bank of New York Mellon.(Haywood, Taylor)
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by The Bank of New York Mellon. (Haywood, Taylor)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 11/14/2019 Granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint is extended to 11/26/2019. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 11/14/2019 Granting #5 Motion to Substitute Party. The Bank of New York Mellon is substituted as a defendant in place of The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin D Balser on behalf of The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: Justin D. Balser (Balser, Justin)
November 11, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haywood, Taylor)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Substitute Party by The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haywood, Taylor)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Haywood, Taylor)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 12/6/2019 at 09:20 AM (CT) before Judge William C Griesbach. The court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be re-scheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov (cc: all counsel)(mac)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation. (Haywood, Taylor)
November 5, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation from State of Wisconsin Circuit Court Forest County, Case Number: 2019CV000057 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3269480) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Pleadings in Case No. 2019CV000057)(Haywood, Taylor) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2019: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (amb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houle et al v. The Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Houle
Represented By: Robert A Kennedy, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Houle
Represented By: Robert A Kennedy, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation
Represented By: Taylor Haywood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Taylor Haywood
Represented By: Justin D Balser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?