Wildenberg v. Crystal Print, Inc.
Plaintiff: Seth Wildenberg
Defendant: Crystal Print, Inc. and Crystal Print Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv01660
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ORDER APPROVING #10 Stipulation to extend time to Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Crystal Print Inc., signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 01/10/2020. Crystal Print Inc. time to Answer or otherwise respond is extended to 1/31/2020. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
January 9, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: (cc: all counsel)RULE 16 Scheduling Conference set for 2/13/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 201, 125 S. Jefferson St., Green Bay, WI 54301 before Judge William C Griesbach. The court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be re-scheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov(cav)
January 8, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION to answer or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiffs Complaint to January 31, 2020 by Crystal Print, Inc. (Dill, Jesse) Modified on 1/9/2020 to reflect correct event (cav).
January 8, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse R Dill on behalf of Crystal Print, Inc.. Attorney(s) appearing: Jesse R. Dill (Dill, Jesse)
January 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Bernard J Bobber on behalf of Crystal Print, Inc.. Attorney(s) appearing: Bernard J. Bobber (Bobber, Bernard)
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Crystal Print, Inc. - Waiver sent on 11/12/2019. (Luzi, Scott)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David M Potteiger on behalf of Seth Wildenberg. Attorney(s) appearing: David M. Potteiger (Potteiger, David)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James A Walcheske on behalf of Seth Wildenberg. Attorney(s) appearing: James A. Walcheske (Walcheske, James)
November 12, 2019 Summons Issued as to Crystal Print, Inc. (lh)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Seth Wildenberg. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Luzi, Scott)
November 12, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott S Luzi on behalf of Seth Wildenberg. Attorney(s) appearing: Scott S. Luzi, James A. Walcheske, David M. Potteiger (Luzi, Scott)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Seth Wildenberg. (Luzi, Scott)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Crystal Print, Inc. by Seth Wildenberg. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3274945) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Seth Wildenberg Consent to Join Form)(Luzi, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wildenberg v. Crystal Print, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Print, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Print Inc
Represented By: Bernard J Bobber
Represented By: Jesse R Dill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth Wildenberg
Represented By: James A Walcheske
Represented By: David M Potteiger
Represented By: Scott S Luzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?