USA v. Summit Contracting Inc et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Chad M Schampers, Nathaniel R Smith and Summit Contracting Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv01743
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Filing 8 Defendant's Verified ANSWER to #1 Complaint for Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Answer to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Answer to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Answer to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Answer to Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E to Answer to Complaint, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F to Answer to Complaint)(Reetz, Brett)
January 14, 2020 Filing 7 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Reetz, Brett)
December 6, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 201, 125 S. Jefferson St., Green Bay, WI 54301 before Judge William C Griesbach (if necessary). (cc: all counsel)(mac)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William C Griesbach: Telephone Motion Hearing held on 12/6/2019. Defendant's response to Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is due by 1/15/2020. Reply due by 2/3/2020. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2020 01:30 PM before Judge William C Griesbach (if necessary). (Tape #120619) (mac)
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Defendants. (Reetz, Brett)
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett E Reetz on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Brett Reetz (Reetz, Brett)
December 2, 2019 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, for further guidance (cav)
December 2, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (cav)
December 2, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Telephone Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge William C Griesbach. (cc: all counsel, via email to Attorney Brett Reetz on behalf of Defendants)(mac)
November 27, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (cmb)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 BRIEF in Support filed by United States of America re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Constantine, Emily)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by United States of America. (Constantine, Emily)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chad M Schampers, Nathaniel R Smith, Summit Contracting Inc by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Constantine, Emily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Summit Contracting Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad M Schampers
Represented By: Brett E Reetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathaniel R Smith
Represented By: Brett E Reetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Contracting Inc
Represented By: Brett E Reetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Emily Ann Constantine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?