Braatz v. Check and Cash LLC et al
Appellee: Check and Cash LLC
Appellant: Suzanne M Braatz
Case Number: 1:2019cv01891
Filed: December 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Filing 4 BRIEFING LETTER Electronically Transmitted to counsel and via US Mail to Appellee (lh) Modified transmission text on 1/24/2020 (lh).
January 24, 2020 Filing 3 RECORD ON APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-2088. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet with Bankruptcy Documents 1-3, 5, 7, 9, 13, and 15-16, #2 Adversary Docket Sheet with Adversary Documents 1-13, 15-16, 18-20, and 23, #3 Appellant's Certificate Regarding Transcript)(kan)
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - BRIEFING LETTER Transmitted to Parties. (Correction via CM/ECF to counsel) (cav) Modified on 12/27/2019 to note briefing letter was sent prematurely (cav).
December 26, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach (jcl)
December 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL (Short Record) from Bankruptcy Court case number 19-2088; (Attachments: #1 Adversary Proceeding Docket Sheet, #2 Document 15 - Decision and Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment and Document 16 - Entry of Judgment)(ljr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braatz v. Check and Cash LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Check and Cash LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Suzanne M Braatz
Represented By: Eliza M Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?