FM Products Inc v. Classic Gears and Machining Inc et al
Plaintiff: FM Products, Inc.
Defendant: Lori A Kuether, Classic Gears and Machining, Inc., Jeffrey S Schmid and CGMI, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00079
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
March 5, 2020 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William C Griesbach: Scheduling Conference held on 3/5/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 5/1/2020, Discovery due by 5/16/2021, Plaintiffs Expert Witness List due by 2/28/2021, Defendants Expert Witness List due by 4/15/2021, Motions due by 6/16/2021, Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/8/2021 01:30 PM before Judge William C Griesbach. Jury Trial set for 11/8/2021 08:30 AM before Judge William C Griesbach. (Tape #030520) (cav)
February 26, 2020 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by All Defendants. (Van Lieshout, David)
February 14, 2020 Filing 11 Plaintiff's ANSWER to Counterclaim and Affirmative Defenses filed by All Plaintiffs. (Streicher, Rodman)
February 7, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 3/5/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge William C Griesbach. The court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be re-scheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov (cc: all counsel)(mac)
February 7, 2020 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #9 Answer and Counterclaim; Electronically filed documents should not be scanned whenever possible. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (mac)
February 7, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint AND COUNTERCLAIM against FM Products, Inc. with Jury Demand filed by CGMI LLC, Classic Gears and Machining Inc, Lori A Kuether, Jeffrey S Schmid . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Van Lieshout, David)
February 7, 2020 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Streicher, Rodman)
February 6, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE Statement by CGMI LLC. (Van Lieshout, David)
February 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David J Van Lieshout on behalf of CGMI LLC, Classic Gears and Machining Inc, Lori A Kuether, Jeffrey S Schmid. Attorney(s) appearing: David J. Van Lieshout (Van Lieshout, David)
January 17, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
January 17, 2020 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (mac)
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by FM Products, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(mac)
January 17, 2020 Filing 4 DISREGARD. REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs 1:20-cv-79 (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Streicher, Rodman) Modified on 1/17/2020 (mac).
January 17, 2020 Filing 3 DISREGARD. REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs 1:20-cv-00079 (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Streicher, Rodman) Modified on 1/17/2020 (mac).
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 DISREGARD. REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs 1:20-cv-79 (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Streicher, Rodman) Modified on 1/17/2020 (mac).
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT 1:20-cv-79 with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by FM Products, Inc.. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3334195) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Streicher, Rodman) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/17/2020: #12 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FM Products Inc v. Classic Gears and Machining Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori A Kuether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Classic Gears and Machining, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey S Schmid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CGMI, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FM Products, Inc.
Represented By: Rodman W Streicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?