Behnke v. Miravida Living, Inc.
Plaintiff: Bonnie Behnke
Defendant: Miravida Living, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00175
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Filing 14 Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Miravida Living, Inc..(Trotier, Geoffrey)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
March 20, 2020 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William C Griesbach: Scheduling Conference held on 3/20/2020, Amended Pleadings due by 4/24/2020, Discovery due by 12/22/2020, Plaintiffs Expert Witness List due by 7/24/2020, Defendants Expert Witness List due by 9/25/2020, Motions due by 1/22/2021, Rule 26(a) Disclosures to be exchanged by 4/3/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/30/2021 01:30 PM before Judge William C Griesbach. Jury Trial set for 5/17/2021 08:30 AM before Judge William C Griesbach. (Tape #032020) (cav)
March 12, 2020 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE Statement by Miravida Living, Inc.. (Trotier, Geoffrey)
March 12, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John Rubin on behalf of Miravida Living, Inc.. Attorney(s) appearing: John A. Rubin (Rubin, John)
March 12, 2020 Filing 9 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Bonnie Behnke. (Walcheske, James)
February 20, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Miravida Living, Inc. - Waiver sent on 2/6/2020. (Walcheske, James)
February 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 3/20/2020 at 09:20 AM before Judge William C Griesbach. The court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be re-scheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov (cc: all counsel)(mac)
February 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey S Trotier on behalf of Miravida Living, Inc.. Attorney(s) appearing: Geoffrey S. Trotier (Trotier, Geoffrey)
February 6, 2020 Summons Issued as to Miravida Living, Inc. (lh)
February 5, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James A Walcheske on behalf of Bonnie Behnke. Attorney(s) appearing: James A. Walcheske (Walcheske, James)
February 5, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Bonnie Behnke. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Luzi, Scott)
February 5, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
February 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott S Luzi on behalf of Bonnie Behnke. Attorney(s) appearing: Scott S. Luzi (Luzi, Scott)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Bonnie Behnke. (Luzi, Scott)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Miravida Living, Inc. by Bonnie Behnke. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3352910) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Luzi, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Behnke v. Miravida Living, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miravida Living, Inc.
Represented By: Geoffrey S Trotier
Represented By: John Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Behnke
Represented By: James A Walcheske
Represented By: Scott S Luzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?