Roellchen v. EGS Financial Care Inc
Plaintiff: Eric Roellchen
Defendant: EGS Financial Care Inc
Case Number: 1:2020cv00193
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #11 Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (UNOPPOSED) filed by EGS Financial Care Inc., signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 04/01/2020. Defendant's answer due 4/21/2020. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
March 31, 2020 Filing 11 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (AGREED) by EGS Financial Care Inc. (Morrissey, James)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (AGREED, filed by EGS Financial Care Inc, signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 03/04/2020. EGS Financial Care Inc answer due 3/31/2020. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
March 2, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (AGREED) by EGS Financial Care Inc. (Morrissey, James)
March 2, 2020 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE Statement by EGS Financial Care Inc. (Morrissey, James)
March 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by James J Morrissey on behalf of EGS Financial Care Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: James J. Morrissey (Morrissey, James)
March 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna-Katrina S Christakis on behalf of EGS Financial Care Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Anna-Katrina S. Christakis (Christakis, Anna-Katrina)
February 18, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eric Roellchen. EGS Financial Care Inc served on 2/10/2020. (Greene, Francis)
February 10, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Eric Roellchen. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Thomasson, Andrew)
February 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew T Thomasson on behalf of Eric Roellchen. Attorney(s) appearing: Andrew T. Thomasson (Thomasson, Andrew)
February 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Katelyn Busby on behalf of Eric Roellchen. Attorney(s) appearing: Katelyn B. Busby (Busby, Katelyn)
February 7, 2020 Summons Issued as to EGS Financial Care Inc. (mac)
February 7, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (bx)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against EGS Financial Care, Inc. by Eric Roellchen. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3355852) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Greene, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roellchen v. EGS Financial Care Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Roellchen
Represented By: Francis R Greene
Represented By: Katelyn Busby
Represented By: Andrew T Thomasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EGS Financial Care Inc
Represented By: James J Morrissey
Represented By: Anna-Katrina S Christakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?