Christenson et al v. Azar
Plaintiff: Anniken Prosser and David Christenson
Defendant: Alex Azar
Case Number: 1:2020cv00194
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: (cc: all counsel) Telephone Conference set for 4/7/2020 at 10:00 AM in By Telephone before Judge William C Griesbach. The Court will initiate the call. (lh)
April 3, 2020 Filing 5 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Complaint by Alex Azar. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Larsen, Christian)
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Robert Theine Pledl Declaration of Service (Pledl, Robert)
February 10, 2020 Summons Issued as to Alex Azar. (cav)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Pledl, Robert)
February 7, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (bx)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Pledl, Robert)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Plaintiffs by David Christenson. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3355958)(Pledl, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/7/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ds).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christenson et al v. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Azar
Represented By: Christian R Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anniken Prosser
Represented By: Robert Theine Pledl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Christenson
Represented By: Robert Theine Pledl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?