Bates v. Arcadia Home Care and Staffing
Plaintiff: Annie Mae Bates
Defendant: Arcadia Home Care and Staffing
Case Number: 1:2020cv00391
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2003
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Filing 5 JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk and approved by Judge William C Griesbach on 4/13/2020. (cc: all counsel and via US Mail to Bates)(lh)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 4/13/2020. This case is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Civil Local rule 41(c). The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. (cc: all counsel and via US Mail to Bates)(Griesbach, William)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 3/18/2020. Plaintiff shall either file an amended Motion to proceed in forma pauperis, pay the full filing fee of $400.00, or show further cause why the fee should be waived. Given the declaration provided, this court is unable to waive the filing fee. (cc: all counsel and via US Mail to Bates)(Griesbach, William)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Annie Mae Bates. (cav)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Arcadia Home Care and Staffing filed by Annie Mae Bates. Consent forms and Pro Se Service Packet distributed for Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. (cav)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bates v. Arcadia Home Care and Staffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Mae Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arcadia Home Care and Staffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?