Lee v. James
Plaintiff: Lavall T Lee
Defendant: CO William James, Warden Paul Kemper, Kevin Carr and William James
Case Number: 1:2020cv00396
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Filing 9 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE BY DOJ as to William James (Remington, Jennifer)
April 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Renee Remington on behalf of William James. Attorney(s) appearing: Jennifer Remington (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Remington, Jennifer)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCREENING ORDER signed by Judge William C. Griesbach on 4/2/2020. Plaintiff's #2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Paul Kemper and Kevin Carr are DISMISSED as defendants. Defendant shall file a responsive pleading to the complaint within 60 days. (cc: all counsel and via US Mail to Lee and Officer in charge)(Griesbach, William)
April 1, 2020 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $16.78, receipt number MK4689-082120. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (jcl)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that within 21 days plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $16.78 as an initial partial filing fee in this action, signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 3/20/2020. (cc: all counsel, via US Mail to Plaintiff and Warden and RCI)(Griesbach, William)
March 20, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Lavall T Lee. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (cmb)
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Mailed to plaintiff. (cmb) (Main Document 4 replaced on 3/16/2020 with correct letter) (cmb).
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Lavall T Lee. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(cmb)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Lavall T Lee. (cmb)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with jury demand filed against All Defendants by Lavall T Lee. (cmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO William James
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Paul Kemper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William James
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Represented By: Jennifer Renee Remington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lavall T Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?