Johnson v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Tonia Johnson
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2020cv00501
Filed: March 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Filing 8 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; US Attorney General served on 4/13/2020. (blr)
April 13, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; Commissioner of Social Security served on 4/13/2020. (blr)
April 6, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
April 6, 2020 Transmit #1 Complaint and #4 Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF. (blr)
April 4, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Tonia Johnson. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Skaar, Daniel)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 4/3/2020 GRANTING #3 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. (cc: all counsel) (jm)
March 30, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
March 29, 2020 Filing 3 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Tonia Johnson. (Skaar, Daniel)
March 29, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Tonia Johnson. (Skaar, Daniel)
March 29, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Tonia Johnson (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Unfavorable Notice of Decision, #3 Exhibit Appeals Council Denial)(Skaar, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonia Johnson
Represented By: Daniel A Skaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?