Yang et al v. Powers et al
Plaintiff: Paul Martin Driftmeier, Sr., Jenny Leigh Turkelson, Sandra Morris, Jaime Lynn Westcomb, Jay Schroeder, Jestin Korleski,, Angela Haug, Anna Alethia Manning, Lenae Lenore Gilbertson, Eric Thomas Skelton, Thomas Wulf, Madison Marie Elmer, Cindy Werner, Daniel Jay Quakkelaar, Kelly McElwain, Blong Yang, Alexandra Carney Schweitzer, Mary Magdalen Moser, Gayelynn Plaster, Cecilia Sanchez, Lisa A. Binning, William H. Nauta, Luis Vergara, Darcy Bloom and Elizabeth Thorne
Defendant: Kurt Eggebrecht, Commissioner Marge Bostelmann, Mark L Thompson, Susan Powers, Janel Heinrich, Jeanette Kowalik, Douglas Gieryn, Greg Peterson, Commissioner Robert F Spindell, Jr., Daniel Blackdeer, Julie M Glancey, Meagan Wolfe, Dottie-Kay Bowersox, Marie-Noel Sandoval, Commissioner Dean Knudson, RoAnn Warden, Sanjib Bhattacharyya, Mary Dorn, Andrea Palm, Ann S Jacobs, Anthony Steven Evers, David Beth, Joseph M Cardamone, III, Jody Ward and Dean M. Smith
Case Number: 1:2020cv00760
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 DECISION AND ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 7/17/2020 DENYING AS MOOT #24 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #37 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Jurisdiction, and #41 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The Court GRANTS #32 Motion to Dismiss. The complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiffs will be allowed 30 days from the date of this order in which to file an amended complaint curing the defects noted herein. If no amended complaint is filed within the time allowed, the case will be dismissed with prejudice. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
July 16, 2020 Filing 43 RESPONSE to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #41 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Support of Their Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction . (Voiland, Joseph)
July 15, 2020 Filing 42 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Sanjib Bhattacharyya, Janel Heinrich, Jeanette Kowalik re #24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Bitar, Remzy)
July 15, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Support of Their Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by Sanjib Bhattacharyya, Janel Heinrich, Jeanette Kowalik. (Bitar, Remzy)
July 14, 2020 Filing 40 RESPONSE to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #32 MOTION to Dismiss for Noncompliance with Rule 20 Governing Joinder of Parties . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Madison Dane Emergency Order #1 May 13 2020, #2 Exhibit Associated Press Article May 15 2020, #3 Exhibit Wisconsin Watch Article May 15 2020, #4 Exhibit Cuomo Slip Opinion N.D.N.Y.)(Voiland, Joseph)
July 13, 2020 Filing 39 DECLARATION of Jason P. Gehring (Attachments: #1 Emergency Order 28, #2 Lopez v. Grand Chute Police Dept., #3 Jackson v. Bloomfield Police Dept., #4 Jackson v. Bloomfield Police Dept.)(Woehl, Dustin)
July 13, 2020 Filing 38 BRIEF in Support filed by Greg Peterson re #37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Woehl, Dustin)
July 13, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Greg Peterson. (Woehl, Dustin)
July 13, 2020 Filing 36 STIPULATION Regarding Deadline for Answering or Otherwise Responding to the Amended Complaint by Greg Peterson. (Woehl, Dustin)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TEXT ONLY ORDER APPROVING #30 STIPULATION regarding deadline for answering or otherwise responding to the amended complaint, filed by Daniel Blackdeer, Anthony Steven Evers, and Andrea Palm, signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 07/13/2020. The deadline for Defendants Susan Powers, Mary Dorn, Douglas Gieryn, Kurt Eggebrecht, Janel Heinrich, Daniel Blackdeer, Marie-Noel Sandoval, RoAnn Warden, Dottie-Kay Bowersox, Jeanette Kowalik, Sanjib Bhattacharyya, Anthony Steven Evers, Andrea Palm, David Beth, Joseph M. Cardamone, III, Jody Ward, and Dean M. Smith to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint shall be either the date on which responsive pleadings are due under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(a)(1)(A) or fourteen days after the court issues a decision on the plaintiffs' preliminary injunction motion, whichever date is later. This stipulation does not impact Defendant Greg Peterson, who is not a signatory to the stipulation. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
July 13, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Dustin T Woehl on behalf of Greg Peterson. (Woehl, Dustin)
July 10, 2020 Filing 33 BRIEF in Support filed by Marie-Noel Sandoval, David Beth, Sanjib Bhattacharyya, Joseph M Cardamone, III, Mary Dorn, Douglas Gieryn, Janel Heinrich, Jeanette Kowalik, Susan Powers, Dean M. Smith, RoAnn Warden re #32 MOTION to Dismiss for Noncompliance with Rule 20 Governing Joinder of Parties . (Bitar, Remzy)
July 10, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss for Noncompliance with Rule 20 Governing Joinder of Parties by Marie-Noel Sandoval, David Beth, Sanjib Bhattacharyya, Joseph M Cardamone, III, Mary Dorn, Douglas Gieryn, Janel Heinrich, Jeanette Kowalik, Susan Powers, Dean M. Smith, RoAnn Warden. (Bitar, Remzy)
July 10, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason P Gehring on behalf of Greg Peterson. (Gehring, Jason)
July 10, 2020 Filing 30 STIPULATION Regarding Deadline for Answering or Otherwise Responding to the Amended Complaint by Daniel Blackdeer, Anthony Steven Evers, Andrea Palm. (Bellavia, Thomas)
July 8, 2020 Filing 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William C Griesbach: Motion Hearing held on 7/8/2020 re Plaintiffs #24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants Motion to Dismiss is due 7/10/2020. Response is due by 7/14/2020. Response to Plaintiffs' #24 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is due 7/15/2020. Reply is due 7/17/2020. (Tape #070720) (lh)
July 6, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Sadie R Zurfluh on behalf of Marie-Noel Sandoval, David Beth, Joseph M Cardamone, III, Mary Dorn, Janel Heinrich, Dean M. Smith. Attorney(s) appearing: Sadie R. Zurfluh (Zurfluh, Sadie)
July 6, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Remzy D Bitar on behalf of Marie-Noel Sandoval, David Beth, Joseph M Cardamone, III, Mary Dorn, Janel Heinrich, Dean M. Smith. Attorney(s) appearing: Remzy D. Bitar (Bitar, Remzy)
July 6, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : (cc: all counsel) Motion Hearing set for 7/7/2020 11:00 AM in By Telephone before Judge William C Griesbach with counsel for Plaintiffs and counsel for Milwaukee County and Dane County Defendants. All other parties to this action are not required to appear. Instructions: Participants and Interested Members of the Public are to call in to 1-888-273-3658, using Access Code 4416978, and Security Code 1234. Members of the Public may call in to listen to this hearing, but must remain silent for the duration of the hearing. Please contact the Office of the Clerk at 920-455-7381 if you should have any questions. Case participants must verify their attendance by sending an email to wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov (lh)
July 6, 2020 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #25 Brief in Support of Motion; Certain attachments (Affidavits) to this document should have been filed as separate entries. This document does NOT need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (lh)
July 3, 2020 Filing 25 BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Rev. Daniel Jay Quakkelaar, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Angela Haug, #3 Exhibit Madison Dane County Emergency Order #7, #4 Exhibit Madison Dane County Emergency Order #1, #5 Exhibit Madison Dane County Emergency Order #2, #6 Exhibit Madison Dane County Emergency Order #3, #7 Exhibit Madison Dane County Emergency Order #4, #8 Exhibit Madison Dane County Emergency Order #5, #9 Exhibit Madison Dane County Emergency Order #6, #10 Exhibit Dane County Ordinance Section 46.40 May 2020, #11 Exhibit Milwaukee Order #4, #12 Exhibit Milwaukee Order #1, #13 Exhibit Milwaukee Order #2, #14 Exhibit Milwaukee Order #3, #15 Exhibit Milwaukee Ordinance chapter 17, #16 Exhibit Milwaukee Ordinances chapter 62, #17 Exhibit Soos v. Cuomo (N.D.N.Y. June 26, 2020), #18 Exhibit South Bay United Pentecostal v. Newsom (U.S. May 29, 2020), #19 Exhibit Supplemental Temporary Injunction in Yandel v. City of Racine, #20 Exhibit Article: Area coronavirus testing sites see decrease in people getting tested, leaving doctors concernedng, #21 Exhibit Article: Dane County Sheriff Downtown Madison not currently safe, #22 Exhibit Article: How to Protest during a pandemic, #23 Exhibit Article: Protesters plan Capitol demonstration to demand justice following George Floyd's death, #24 Exhibit Article: Protesters sing happy birthday to Breona Taylor, #25 Exhibit Article: Thousands March from Bayview to Downtown)(Voiland, Joseph)
July 3, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Voiland, Joseph)
July 2, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory P Kruse on behalf of Sanjib Bhattacharyya, Jeanette Kowalik. Attorney(s) appearing: Gregory Kruse (Kruse, Gregory)
July 2, 2020 Filing 22 DISCLOSURE Statement by Dottie-Kay Bowersox. (Wolfgang, John)
July 2, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by John A Wolfgang on behalf of Dottie-Kay Bowersox. Attorney(s) appearing: John A. Wolfgang, Gregg J. Gunta, Ann C. Wirth, Jasmyne M. Baynard (Wolfgang, John)
July 2, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Jasmyne M Baynard on behalf of Dottie-Kay Bowersox. Attorney(s) appearing: Jasmyne M. Baynard, Gregg J. Gunta, John A. Wolfgang, Ann C. Wirth (Baynard, Jasmyne)
July 2, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Ann C Wirth on behalf of Dottie-Kay Bowersox. Attorney(s) appearing: Ann C. Wirth, Gregg J. Gunta, John A. Wolfgang, Jasmyne M. Baynard (Wirth, Ann)
July 2, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregg J Gunta on behalf of Dottie-Kay Bowersox. Attorney(s) appearing: Gregg J. Gunta, Ann C. Wirth, John A. Wolfgang, Jasmyne M. Baynard (Gunta, Gregg)
July 1, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Colin Hector on behalf of Daniel Blackdeer, Anthony Steven Evers, Andrea Palm. Attorney(s) appearing: Colin A. Hector (Hector, Colin)
July 1, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas C Bellavia on behalf of Daniel Blackdeer, Anthony Steven Evers, Andrea Palm. Attorney(s) appearing: Thomas C. Bellavia (Bellavia, Thomas)
June 30, 2020 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE Statement by Jody Ward. (Wolfgang, John)
June 30, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by John A Wolfgang on behalf of Jody Ward. Attorney(s) appearing: John A. Wolfgang, Gregg J. Gunta, Ann C. Wirth, Jasmyne M. Baynard (Wolfgang, John)
June 30, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jasmyne M Baynard on behalf of Jody Ward. Attorney(s) appearing: Jasmyne M. Baynard, Gregg J. Gunta, John A. Wolfgang, Ann C. Wirth (Baynard, Jasmyne)
June 30, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregg J Gunta on behalf of Jody Ward. Attorney(s) appearing: Gregg J. Gunta, Ann C. Wirth, John A. Wolfgang, Jasmyne M. Baynard (Gunta, Gregg)
June 30, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Ann C Wirth on behalf of Jody Ward. Attorney(s) appearing: Ann C. Wirth, Gregg J. Gunta, John A. Wolfgang, Jasmyne M. Baynard (Wirth, Ann)
June 25, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregg J Gunta on behalf of Kurt Eggebrecht. Attorney(s) appearing: Gregg J. Gunta, Ann C. Wirth, John A. Wolfgang, Jasmyne M. Baynard (Gunta, Gregg)
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ann C Wirth on behalf of Kurt Eggebrecht. Attorney(s) appearing: Ann C. Wirth, Gregg J. Gunta, John A. Wolfgang, Jasmyne M. Baynard (Wirth, Ann)
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jasmyne M Baynard on behalf of Kurt Eggebrecht. Attorney(s) appearing: Jasmyne M. Baynard, Gregg J. Gunta, John A. Wolfgang, Ann C. Wirth (Baynard, Jasmyne)
June 25, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE Statement by Kurt Eggebrecht. (Wolfgang, John)
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John A Wolfgang on behalf of Kurt Eggebrecht. Attorney(s) appearing: John A. Wolfgang, Gregg J. Gunta, Ann C. Wirth, Jasmyne M. Baynard (Wolfgang, John)
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew T Phillips on behalf of Douglas Gieryn, Susan Powers, RoAnn Warden. Attorney(s) appearing: Andrew T. Phillips (Phillips, Andrew)
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph M Russell on behalf of Susan Powers, Douglas Gieryn and Roann Warden. Attorney(s) appearing: Joseph M. Russell, Andrew T. Phillips (Russell, Joseph) Modified filers on 6/24/2020.(lh)
June 18, 2020 Summons Issued as to Marie-Noel Sandoval, David Beth, Sanjib Bhattacharyya, Daniel Blackdeer, Dottie-Kay Bowersox, Joseph M Cardamone, III, Kurt Eggebrecht. (lh)
June 18, 2020 Summons Issued as to Mary Dorn, Anthony Steven Evers, Douglas Gieryn, Janel Heinrich, Jeanette Kowalik, Andrea Palm, Greg Peterson, Susan Powers, Dean M. Smith, Jody Ward, RoAnn Warden. (lh)
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons)(Voiland, Joseph)
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT Parties Added: P William H. Nauta P Lisa A. Binning P Darcy Bloom P Gayelynn Plaster P Luis A. Vergara P Cecilia Sanchez P Elizabeth Thorne P Mary Magdalen Moser D David Beth D Joseph Cardamone, III D Jody Ward D Dean M. Smith Parties Termed: P Thomas Wulf D Marge Bostelmann D Julie M. Glancey D Ann S. Jacobs D Dean Knudson D Robert F. Spindell, Jr. D Mark L. Thomsen D Meagan Wolfe against Marie-Noel Sandoval, Sanjib Bhattacharyya, Daniel Blackdeer, Dottie-Kay Bowersox, Mary Dorn, Kurt Eggebrecht, Anthony Steven Evers, Douglas Gieryn, Janel Heinrich, Jeanette Kowalik, Andrea Palm, Greg Peterson, Susan Powers, RoAnn Warden, David Beth, Joseph M Cardamone, III, Jody Ward, Dean M. Smith filed by Madison Marie Elmer, Jay Schroeder, Lenae Lenore Gilbertson, Blong Yang, Jenny Leigh Turkelson, Cindy Werner, Alexandra Carney Schweitzer, Jaime Lynn Westcomb, Daniel Jay Quakkelaar, Paul Martin Driftmeier, Sr., Sandra Morris, Jestin Korleski,, Anna Alethia Manning, Eric Thomas Skelton, Angela Haug, Kelly McElwain, Luis Vergara, Gayelynn Plaster, Mary Magdalen Moser, Elizabeth Thorne, Cecilia Sanchez, Darcy Bloom, William H. Nauta, Lisa A. Binning. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Undated Letter from Outagamie County Executive to Attorney General Kaul, #2 Exhibit Wisconsin OAG, 03-20)(Voiland, Joseph)
May 20, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF, TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, AND DAMAGES against All Defendants by all Plaintiffs. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3456747) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Undated letter from Outagamie County Executive to Attorney General Kaul, #2 Exhibit Wisconsin OAG 20-03)(Voiland, Joseph)(Additional attachment(s) added on 5/20/2020: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl). Modified on 5/21/2020 (mac).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yang et al v. Powers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt Eggebrecht
Represented By: Ann C Wirth
Represented By: Jasmyne M Baynard
Represented By: John A Wolfgang
Represented By: Gregg J Gunta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Marge Bostelmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Powers
Represented By: Andrew T Phillips
Represented By: Joseph M Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janel Heinrich
Represented By: Remzy D Bitar
Represented By: Sadie R Zurfluh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanette Kowalik
Represented By: Gregory P Kruse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Gieryn
Represented By: Andrew T Phillips
Represented By: Joseph M Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Peterson
Represented By: Jason P Gehring
Represented By: Dustin T Woehl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Robert F Spindell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Blackdeer
Represented By: Thomas C Bellavia
Represented By: Colin Hector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie M Glancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meagan Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dottie-Kay Bowersox
Represented By: Ann C Wirth
Represented By: Jasmyne M Baynard
Represented By: John A Wolfgang
Represented By: Gregg J Gunta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie-Noel Sandoval
Represented By: Remzy D Bitar
Represented By: Sadie R Zurfluh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Dean Knudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RoAnn Warden
Represented By: Andrew T Phillips
Represented By: Joseph M Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanjib Bhattacharyya
Represented By: Gregory P Kruse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Dorn
Represented By: Remzy D Bitar
Represented By: Sadie R Zurfluh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Palm
Represented By: Thomas C Bellavia
Represented By: Colin Hector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann S Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Steven Evers
Represented By: Thomas C Bellavia
Represented By: Colin Hector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Beth
Represented By: Remzy D Bitar
Represented By: Sadie R Zurfluh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M Cardamone, III
Represented By: Remzy D Bitar
Represented By: Sadie R Zurfluh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jody Ward
Represented By: Ann C Wirth
Represented By: Jasmyne M Baynard
Represented By: John A Wolfgang
Represented By: Gregg J Gunta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean M. Smith
Represented By: Remzy D Bitar
Represented By: Sadie R Zurfluh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Martin Driftmeier, Sr.
Represented By: Joseph W Voiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenny Leigh Turkelson
Represented By: Joseph W Voiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Morris
Represented By: Joseph W Voiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Lynn Westcomb
Represented By: Joseph W Voiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Schroeder
Represented By: Joseph W Voiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jestin Korleski,
Represented By: Joseph W Voiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Haug
Represented By: Joseph W Voiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Alethia Manning
Represented By: Joseph W Voiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenae Lenore Gilbertson
Represented By: Joseph W Voiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Thomas Skelton
Represented By: Joseph W Voiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Wulf
Represented By: Joseph W Voiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madison Marie Elmer
Represented By: Joseph W Voiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Werner
Represented By: Joseph W Voiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Jay Quakkelaar
Represented By: Joseph W Voiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly McElwain
Represented By: Joseph W Voiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blong Yang
Represented By: Joseph W Voiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Carney Schweitzer
Represented By: Joseph W Voiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Magdalen Moser
Represented By: Joseph W Voiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gayelynn Plaster
Represented By: Joseph W Voiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecilia Sanchez
Represented By: Joseph W Voiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa A. Binning
Represented By: Joseph W Voiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William H. Nauta
Represented By: Joseph W Voiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Vergara
Represented By: Joseph W Voiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darcy Bloom
Represented By: Joseph W Voiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Thorne
Represented By: Joseph W Voiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?