Equitz v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Earl Equitz
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2020cv01072
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Transmit Complaint and Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF (mac)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 9/2/2020 Granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. (cc: all counsel, via US Mail to Equitz) (Griesbach, William)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Earl Equitz. (cmb)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 8/10/2020 denying #4 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall either pay the filing fee or file a complete motion within 21 days of the date of this order or risk dismissal. (cc: all counsel and via US Mail to Equitz) (Griesbach, William)
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Earl Equitz. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (blr)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Earl Equitz. (blr)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 Returned as Undeliverable for Earl Equitz re IFP Form mailed to him on 7/16/2020. (cmb) Modified on 7/27/2020 (tlf).
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 LETTER from the Clerk to Earl Equitz requesting that he submit the consent/refusal form for Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries within 21 days. Plaintiff must also pay the $400.00 filing fee or submit his request to proceed without prepayment within 21 days. (tlf)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Earl Equitz ;Consent forms distributed to the parties for Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Dries (asc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equitz v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Equitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?