Williams v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Melvyn Louis Williams
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2020cv01073
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan C Hugo on behalf of Social Security Administration. Attorney(s) appearing: Megan C. Hugo (Hugo, Megan)
August 10, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; by Melvyn Louis Williams US Attorney General served on 8/6/2020. (cav)
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to the parties: Plaintiffs brief due 11/16/2020; Defendants response due 12/24/2020; Plaintiffs reply due 1/8/2021. (cc: all counsel and via US Mail to Melvyn Williams) (cav)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; Commissioner of Social Security served on 7/28/2020. (cav)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Social Security Administration. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
July 24, 2020 Transmit Complaint and Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF (cav)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee, signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 07/23/2020. (cc: all counsel; Williams via U.S. Mail) (Griesbach, William)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Melvyn Louis Williams. (asc)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Melvyn Louis Williams ;Consent forms distributed to the parties for Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(asc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvyn Louis Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Megan C Hugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?