Cottle et al v. Great West Casualty Company et al
Plaintiff: American Family Insurance Co, United Healthcare Insurance Company, Kelsi L Cottle and American Family Mutual Insurance Company, SI
Defendant: Great West Casualty Company, Dennis A Storlie and Mikes Lines Inc
Case Number: 1:2020cv01093
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE Statement by Mikes Lines Inc. (Starrett, Jay)
September 11, 2020 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE Statement by Great West Casualty Company. (Starrett, Jay) Modified filer on 9/11/2020 (lh).
September 8, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 10/7/2020 10:00 AM before Judge William C Griesbach. Rule 26(f) Report due 9/30/2020. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
September 8, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants.(Schmidt, Pamela)
September 8, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela M Schmidt on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Pamela M. Schmidt (Schmidt, Pamela)
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay R Starrett on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Jay R. Starrett (Starrett, Jay)
August 11, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Defendants. (Hockers, Michelle)
August 6, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Crossclaim filed by Kelsi L Cottle. (Hockers, Michelle)
August 4, 2020 Filing 7 CLAIM and Cross-Claim of American Family Insurance Company by American Family Insurance Co. (Mundt, Rick)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Rick J Mundt on behalf of American Family Insurance Co. Attorney(s) appearing: Rick J. Mundt (Mundt, Rick)
August 1, 2020 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE Statement by United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Mayer, Matthew)
August 1, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Kelsi L Cottle filed by United Healthcare Insurance Company., COUNTERCLAIM against Great West Casualty Company, Mikes Lines Inc, Dennis A Storlie filed by United Healthcare Insurance Company. by United Healthcare Insurance Company.(Mayer, Matthew)
August 1, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew S Mayer on behalf of United Healthcare Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew S. Mayer (Mayer, Matthew)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Hockers, Michelle)
July 17, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Kelsi L Cottle. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3513029) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hockers, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cottle et al v. Great West Casualty Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Family Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew S Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelsi L Cottle
Represented By: Michelle M Hockers
Represented By: Don C Prachthauser
Represented By: Thadd J Llaurado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Family Mutual Insurance Company, SI
Represented By: Rick J Mundt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great West Casualty Company
Represented By: Pamela M Schmidt
Represented By: Jay R Starrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis A Storlie
Represented By: Pamela M Schmidt
Represented By: Jay R Starrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikes Lines Inc
Represented By: Pamela M Schmidt
Represented By: Jay R Starrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?