Esube v. Ultimate Rides, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ekyenga Esube
Defendant: UW Credit Union, Ultimate Rides, Inc. and Ultimate Rides Inc
Case Number: 1:2020cv01096
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ekyenga Esube. Ultimate Rides Inc served on 8/26/2020. (Fons, Mary)
August 28, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 10/7/2020 09:30 AM before Judge William C Griesbach. Rule 26(f) Report due 9/30/2020. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
August 26, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Natalia S Kruse on behalf of UW Credit Union. Attorney(s) appearing: Natalia S. Kruse (Kruse, Natalia)
August 26, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by UW Credit Union.(Kawski, Marci)
August 26, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Marci V Kawski on behalf of UW Credit Union. Attorney(s) appearing: Marci V. Kawski (Kawski, Marci)
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE Statement by Ultimate Rides Inc. (Drabot, Lawrence)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence J Drabot on behalf of Ultimate Rides Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Lawrence J. Drabot (Drabot, Lawrence)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed (Drabot, Lawrence)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 ADMISSION OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint and Jury Demand on August 5, 2020 by UW Credit Union (Fons, Mary)
July 30, 2020 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (cav)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Ekyenga Esube (Fons, Mary)
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 DUPLICATE REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Ekyenga Esube (Fons, Mary) Modified on 7/30/2020 (cav).
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Ekyenga Esube (Fons, Mary)
July 20, 2020 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions,and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (cav)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Ekyenga Esube. (Fons, Mary)
July 17, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Ekyenga Esube. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3513431) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Fons, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Esube v. Ultimate Rides, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UW Credit Union
Represented By: Natalia S Kruse
Represented By: Marci V Kawski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ultimate Rides, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ultimate Rides Inc
Represented By: Lawrence J Drabot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ekyenga Esube
Represented By: Mary C Fons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?