Eick et al v. Pfizer Inc et al
Plaintiff: Andrew J Eick and Dean F Kusik
Defendant: Parke Davis & Co, Warner Lambert Company LLC, Pfizer Inc, Pharmacia Corporation, Warner Lambert Company, Pharmacia LLC, Warner-Lambert Company LLC, Parke Davis & Company LLC and Warner-Lambert Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv01263
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Defendants. (Kushner, Beth)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 BRIEF in Support filed by All Defendants re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Kushner, Beth)
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by All Defendants. (Kushner, Beth)
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by James T Murray, Jr on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: James T. Murray, Jr. (Murray, James)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth J Kushner on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Beth J. Kushner (Kushner, Beth)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by Andrew J Eick, Dean F Kusik. (Kassan, Randi)
September 2, 2020 Summons Issued as to Parke Davis & Company LLC, Pharmacia LLC, Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (tlf)
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Andrew J Eick, Dean F Kusik. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Kassan, Randi)
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Pfizer Inc, Pharmacia LLC f/k/a Pharmacia Corporation, Parke, Davis & Company LLC as successor-in-interest of Parke, Davis & Company, Warner-Lambert Company LLC f/k/a Warner-Lambert Company filed by Andrew J Eick, Dean F Kusik. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Kassan, Randi)
August 18, 2020 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (cav)
August 18, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Parke Davis & Co, Pfizer Inc, Pharmacia Corporation, Warner Lambert Company, Warner Lambert Company LLC by Andrew J Eick, Dean F Kusik. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3541847) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kassan, Randi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eick et al v. Pfizer Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parke Davis & Co
Represented By: Beth J Kushner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Lambert Company LLC
Represented By: Beth J Kushner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Represented By: Beth J Kushner
Represented By: James T Murray, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia Corporation
Represented By: Beth J Kushner
Represented By: James T Murray, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Lambert Company
Represented By: Beth J Kushner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia LLC
Represented By: Beth J Kushner
Represented By: James T Murray, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner-Lambert Company LLC
Represented By: Beth J Kushner
Represented By: James T Murray, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parke Davis & Company LLC
Represented By: Beth J Kushner
Represented By: James T Murray, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner-Lambert Company
Represented By: Beth J Kushner
Represented By: James T Murray, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew J Eick
Represented By: Randi A Kassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean F Kusik
Represented By: Randi A Kassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?