Platten et al v. Smith & Nephew, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jane Platten and Dean Health Plan
Defendant: Smith & Nephew PLC, ABC INSURANCE COMPANY, Smith & Nephew Inc and Smith & Nephew Ltd
Case Number: 1:2020cv01265
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: (cc: all counsel)Telephone Status Conference set for 1/22/2021 01:30 PM in By Telephone before Judge William C Griesbach. The court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov(lh)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 9/25/2020. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, Willialm)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William C Griesbach: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 9/25/2020. Discovery will continue until 12/31/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 1/15/2022, Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 10/15/2020. A Telephone Status Conference is set for 1/22/2021 at 01:30 PM in By Telephone before Judge William C Griesbach. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/17/2022 01:30 PM in Courtroom 253, 517 E Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Judge William C Griesbach. Jury Trial set for 7/11/2022 08:30 AM in Courtroom 201, 125 S. Jefferson St., Green Bay, WI 54301 before Judge William C Griesbach. (lh)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by All Plaintiffs. (Schwaba, Andrew)
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Cecile M Faller on behalf of Jane Platten. Attorney(s) appearing: Cecile M. Faller (Faller, Cecile)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J Schwaba on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Andrew J. Schwaba (Schwaba, Andrew)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 9/25/2020 09:30 AM before Judge William C Griesbach. Rule 26(f) Report due 9/18/2020. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov (cc: all counsel)(tlf)
August 18, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Smith & Nephew, Inc., SMITH & NEPHEW LTD. from Brown County, Case Number: 2020CV000389 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3542035) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court File, #2 Exhibit Complaint served on S&N, Inc., #3 Exhibit Complaint served on S&N, Ltd., #4 Exhibit Declaration of J. Ryan Maloney, #5 Exhibit Dean health printout from Wisconsin department of financial services, #6 Exhibit Responses to plaintiffs interrogatories)(Maloney, J) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2020: #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (mlm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Platten et al v. Smith & Nephew, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew Inc
Represented By: J Ryan Maloney
Represented By: James T Murray, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew Ltd
Represented By: J Ryan Maloney
Represented By: James T Murray, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Platten
Represented By: Cecile M Faller
Represented By: Andrew J Schwaba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Health Plan
Represented By: Jamie A Stock-Retzloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?