United States of America v. Approximately $3315 US Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $3315 US Currency
Claimant: Lucas Baldwin
Case Number: 1:2020cv01278
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Lucas Baldwin.(Richmond, Heather)
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER from AUSA Scott J. Campbell notifying of United States' intention to move for default judgment. (Campbell, Scott)
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Publication (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Campbell, Scott)
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 US Marshal 285 Form returned executed - defendant currency in USMS custody (Campbell, Scott)
August 28, 2020 Warrant for Arrest in Rem Issued (cav)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by United States of America to Lucas Baldwin, c/o Attorney Heather Richmond, of Complaint for Civil Forfeiture of Property (Campbell, Scott)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by United States of America to Lucas Baldwin of Complaint for Civil Forfeiture of Property (Campbell, Scott)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER from AUSA Scott J. Campbell to Clerk of Court. (Campbell, Scott)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by United States of America. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Campbell, Scott)
August 19, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Civil Forfeiture In Rem against Approximately $3315 US Currency by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Warrant for Arrest in Rem)(Campbell, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $3315 US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $3315 US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Scott J Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Lucas Baldwin
Represented By: Heather Lynn Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?