Ward v. Buchanan et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Lee Ward, Jr
Defendant: Sgt Betancourt, Cindy Buchanan and Capt Chatman
Case Number: 1:2020cv01328
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 10/20/2020. Plaintiff will not be required to pay an initial partial filing fee. Plaintiff is directed to notify the Court on or before 11/10/2020 if he wishes to voluntarily dismiss this action. (cc: all counsel and via US Mail to Ward and Warden)(Griesbach, William)
October 19, 2020 Filing 11 Documents filed by Joshua Ward (certification page to trust account statement and proof of service of subpoena) (lh)
October 7, 2020 Filing 10 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Joshua Lee Ward, Jr. (lh)
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER from the plaintiff regarding the case. (cmb)
September 24, 2020 Subpoena issued to Columbia Correctional Institution upon request of Joshua Lee Ward; original document sent to Joshua Lee Ward, Jr via U.S. Mail. (tlf)
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER from the Clerk to Joshua Lee Ward regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (cc: All Counsel) (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet)(tlf)
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Joshua Lee Ward, Jr. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (mac)
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER from the Clerk to Joshua Lee Ward, Jr. The time for plaintiff to submit his magistrate form and certified trust account statement is extended to 10/8/2020. (cc: All Counsel) (tlf)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST for Extension of Time by Joshua Lee Ward, Jr to submit trust account statement and magistrate form. (cmb)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Dries and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting that a full six-month certified prisoner trust account statement be filed within 21 days. Mailed. (cmb)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 FILED IN WRONG CASE. PARTIAL Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Joshua Lee Ward, Jr. (cmb) Modified on 9/3/2020 (tlf).
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Joshua Lee Ward, Jr. (cmb)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with jury demand filed against All Defendants by Joshua Lee Ward, Jr. (cmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. Buchanan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Buchanan
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt Chatman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Lee Ward, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?