Rosner v. Saul
Plaintiff: Dale R. Rosner
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv01346
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 10/22/20 that the defendant file the certified administrative record by December 21, 2020; plaintiff file his opening brief by February 1, 2021; defendant file his response brief by March 15, 2021; and plaintiff file any reply brief by March 30, 2021. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
October 21, 2020 Filing 8 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; US Attorney General served on September 21, 2020. (amb)
October 21, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; Commissioner of Social Security served on September 21, 2020. (amb)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan C Hugo on behalf of Andrew M Saul. Attorney(s) appearing: Megan C. Hugo (Hugo, Megan)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Andrew M Saul. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
September 10, 2020 Transmit Complaint and Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF (asc)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 9/9/20 granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. (cc: all counsel) (jad)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Dale R. Rosner. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Chewning, Donald)
August 31, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Dale R. Rosner. (Chewning, Donald)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Dale R. Rosner (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Appeals Council order, #3 Exhibit ALJ Decision)(Chewning, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosner v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Represented By: Megan C Hugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale R. Rosner
Represented By: Donald J Chewning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?