Barney et al v. Great West Casualty Company et al
Plaintiff: Chelsi Barney, The Farmers Automobile Insurance Association and Matthew D Barney
Defendant: Great West Casualty Company, Dennis A Storlie and Mikes Lines, Inc.
Intervenor Plaintiff: Great Northern Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv01426
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 23 U.S.C. ยง 134
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 10/29/2020. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
October 28, 2020 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William C Griesbach: Scheduling Conference held on 10/28/2020. Written Fact Discovery is due 9/1/2020 and Discovery Cutoff is 10/1/2021. Plaintiffs Expert Witness List due by 3/1/2021, Defendants Expert Witness List due by 7/1/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 9/1/2021, Initial Disclosures were to be exchanged by 10/11/2020, Involuntary Plaintiffs deadline is extended to 11/20/2020. See minute entry for additional deadlines set. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/20/2021 01:30 PM in Courtroom 201, 125 S. Jefferson St., Green Bay, WI 54301 before Judge William C Griesbach., Jury Trial set for 1/10/2022 08:30 AM in Courtroom 201, 125 S. Jefferson St., Green Bay, WI 54301 before Judge William C Griesbach. (Tape #102820) (lh)
October 28, 2020 Filing 20 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Schmidt, Pamela)
October 27, 2020 Filing 19 DISCLOSURE Statement by Great Northern Corporation. (Falk, Matthew)
October 27, 2020 Filing 18 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Great Northern Corporation. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Falk, Matthew)
October 27, 2020 Filing 17 CLAIM and Cross-claim by Great Northern Corporation. (Falk, Matthew)
October 27, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Robert Falk on behalf of Great Northern Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew R. Falk (Falk, Matthew)
October 27, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Rick J Mundt on behalf of The Farmers Automobile Insurance Association. Attorney(s) appearing: Blayne Steinkraus (Mundt, Rick)
October 16, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY filed by Chelsi Barney, Matthew D Barney re #11 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim Reply to Farmer's Cross-Claim. (Curtis, George)
October 12, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Counterclaim re #11 filed by All Defendants. (Schmidt, Pamela)
October 9, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Rick J Mundt on behalf of The Farmers Automobile Insurance Association. (tlf)
October 9, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and CROSSCLAIM against Matthew D Barney, Great West Casualty Company, Mikes Lines, Inc., Dennis A Storlie filed by The Farmers Automobile Insurance Association. (Mundt, Rick) Modified on 10/9/2020 (tlf).
October 8, 2020 Filing 10 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Chelsi Barney, Matthew D Barney. (Curtis, George)
September 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 10/28/2020 09:30 AM before Judge William C Griesbach. Rule 26(f) Report due 10/21/2020. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
September 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay R Starrett on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Jay R. Starrett (Starrett, Jay)
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE Statement by Great West Casualty Company. (Schmidt, Pamela)
September 30, 2020 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE Statement by Mikes Lines, Inc.. (Schmidt, Pamela)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by All Defendants.(Schmidt, Pamela)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dennis A Storlie - Waiver sent on 9/24/2020. (Curtis, George)
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mikes Lines, Inc. - Waiver sent on 9/24/2020. (Curtis, George)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Great West Casualty Company - Waiver sent on 9/24/2020. (Curtis, George)
September 14, 2020 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The disclosure statement and consent/refusal form should be filed as separate documents and not as an attachment to the initiating document. One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (cav)
September 14, 2020 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The jury demand has been modified - please remember to verify that a jury demand is included in the initiating document. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # for further guidance (cav)
September 14, 2020 Summons Issued as to Great West Casualty Company, Mikes Lines, Inc., Dennis A Storlie. (cav)
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Matthew D Barney, Chelsi Barney. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3568706) (Attachments: #1 Summons summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Consent/Refusal, #4 Disclosure Statement)(Curtis, George)
September 11, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barney et al v. Great West Casualty Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great West Casualty Company
Represented By: Pamela M Schmidt
Represented By: Jay R Starrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis A Storlie
Represented By: Pamela M Schmidt
Represented By: Jay R Starrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikes Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Pamela M Schmidt
Represented By: Jay R Starrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsi Barney
Represented By: George W Curtis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Farmers Automobile Insurance Association
Represented By: Blayne N Steinkraus
Represented By: Rick J Mundt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew D Barney
Represented By: George W Curtis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Great Northern Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?