Albert v. Pierce Manufacturing Inc
Plaintiff: Andrew Albert
Defendant: Pierce Manufacturing Inc
Case Number: 1:2020cv01512
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion (unopposed) to Enlarge Time to December 10, 2020 to Respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Pierce Manufacturing Inc., signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 11/25/2020.. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William
November 24, 2020 Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION to Enlarge Time to Respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint by Pierce Manufacturing Inc. (Bobber, Bernard)
November 19, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J Tobin on behalf of Andrew Albert. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew J. Tobin (Tobin, Matthew)
November 5, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Grady Crosby, III on behalf of Pierce Manufacturing Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Grady L. Crosby (Crosby, Grady)
November 5, 2020 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE Statement by Pierce Manufacturing Inc. (Bobber, Bernard)
November 5, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Bernard J Bobber on behalf of Pierce Manufacturing Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Bernard J. Bobber (Bobber, Bernard)
October 28, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Pierce Manufacturing Inc - Waiver sent on 9/29/2020. (Luzi, Scott)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James A Walcheske on behalf of Andrew Albert. Attorney(s) appearing: James A. Walcheske (Walcheske, James)
September 29, 2020 Summons Issued as to Pierce Manufacturing Inc. (tlf)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Andrew Albert. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Luzi, Scott)
September 29, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott S Luzi on behalf of Andrew Albert. Attorney(s) appearing: Scott S. Luzi (Luzi, Scott)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Andrew Albert. (Luzi, Scott)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Pierce Manufacturing, Inc. by Andrew Albert. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3588507) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Luzi, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Albert v. Pierce Manufacturing Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Albert
Represented By: James A Walcheske
Represented By: Scott S Luzi
Represented By: Matthew J Tobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pierce Manufacturing Inc
Represented By: Bernard J Bobber
Represented By: Grady Crosby, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?