Pierce Manufacturing Inc v. Spartan Fire LLC
Plaintiff: Pierce Manufacturing Inc
Defendant: Spartan Fire LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01539
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 145
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 PROTECTIVE ORDER - The Court GRANTS #44 Unopposed Motion for Protective Order, filed by Pierce Manufacturing Inc., signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 11/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Confidentiality Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Designations) (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING #45 Unopposed Motion for Order Regarding E-Discovery, filed by Pierce Manufacturing Inc., signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 11/25/2020. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
November 24, 2020 Filing 45 Unopposed MOTION for Discovery Regarding E-Discovery by Pierce Manufacturing Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Agreed Order Regarding E-Discovery)(Flaherty, Daniel)
November 24, 2020 Filing 44 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by Pierce Manufacturing Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Agreed Protective Order)(Flaherty, Daniel)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 SCHEDULING ORDER: signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 11/09/2020. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
November 6, 2020 Filing 42 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William C Griesbach: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 11/6/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 12/31/2020, All Fact Discovery due by 10/22/2021, Expert disclosures for each party bearing the burden of proof due by 11/19/2021, Rebuttal Expert disclosures due by 12/22/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 2/18/2022, Initial Rule 26(a) Disclosures to be exchanged by 11/13/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/15/2022 01:30 PM in Courtroom 201, 125 S. Jefferson St., Green Bay, WI 54301 before Judge William C Griesbach. Jury Trial set for 8/8/2022 08:30 AM in Courtroom 201, 125 S. Jefferson St., Green Bay, WI 54301 before Judge William C Griesbach. Claim Construction Hearing set for 5/13/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom 201, 125 S. Jefferson St., Green Bay, WI 54301 before Judge William C Griesbach. (See minute entry for complete deadlines.) (Tape #110620) (lh)
October 30, 2020 Filing 41 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Pierce Manufacturing Inc. (Flaherty, Daniel)
October 22, 2020 Filing 40 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Spartan Fire LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Albridge, Kenneth)
October 20, 2020 Filing 39 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Pierce Manufacturing Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pivnick, Scott)
October 19, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Flaherty, Daniel)
October 19, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel T Flaherty on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Daniel T. Flaherty (Flaherty, Daniel)
October 19, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony S Baish on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Anthony S. Baish (Baish, Anthony)
October 16, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin R Cruz on behalf of Spartan Fire LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Justin R. Cruz (Cruz, Justin)
October 8, 2020 Filing 34 DISCLOSURE Statement by Spartan Fire LLC. (Albridge, Kenneth)
October 6, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 11/6/2020 09:30 AM before Judge William C Griesbach. Rule 26(f) Report due 10/30/2020. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
October 5, 2020 Filing 32 Case transferred in from District of Nevada; Case Number 3:20-cv-00471. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 5, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting ECF No. #30 Motion to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Wisconsin, Green Bay Division. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/1/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW) [Transferred from nvd on 10/5/2020.]
October 1, 2020 Filing 30 Joint MOTION to Transfer to the Eastern District of Wisconsin, Green Bay Division re #1 Complaint,,, #29 Answer to Counterclaim, #24 Answer to Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, by Counter Claimant Spartan Fire, LLC, Defendant Spartan Fire, LLC. Responses due by 10/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Prupas, Janine) [Transferred from nvd on 10/5/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 29 ANSWER to #24 Answer to Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, Answer to Counterclaims for Declaratory Judgment filed by Pierce Manufacturing Inc., Pierce Manufacturing Inc..(Feder, Michael) [Transferred from nvd on 10/5/2020.]
September 14, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Docket Correction to #24 Answer to Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, : To reflect that counterclaim is against Pierce Manufacturing Inc. (LE). (no image attached) (LE) [Transferred from nvd on 10/5/2020.]
September 14, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel J. Ryan Gray to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/28/2020. (no image attached) (WJ) [Transferred from nvd on 10/5/2020.]
September 14, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Kenneth M. Albridge III to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/28/2020. (no image attached) (WJ) [Transferred from nvd on 10/5/2020.]
September 14, 2020 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Spartan Fire, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent REV Group, Inc. for Spartan Fire, LLC added. (Prupas, Janine) [Transferred from nvd on 10/5/2020.]
September 14, 2020 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, with Jury Demand (, Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/29/2020.), COUNTERCLAIM against Pierce Manufacturing Inc. Srtan Fire, LLC by Spartan Fire, LLC. filed by Spartan Fire, LLpaC.(Prupas, Janine) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 9/14/2020 to reflect that counterclaim is against Pierce Manufacturing Inc. (LE). [Transferred from nvd on 10/5/2020.]
September 9, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pierce Manufacturing Inc. re #1 Complaint,,,. Spartan Fire, LLC served on 8/24/2020. (Feder, Michael) [Transferred from nvd on 10/5/2020.]
September 4, 2020 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Joshua M. Weeks is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (WJ) Modified on 9/14/2020 COMPLIED (WJ). [Transferred from nvd on 10/5/2020.]
September 4, 2020 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Emily Grand is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (WJ) Modified on 9/14/2020 COMPLIED (WJ). [Transferred from nvd on 10/5/2020.]
September 4, 2020 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Lindsay C. Church is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (WJ) Modified on 9/14/2020 COMPLIED (WJ). [Transferred from nvd on 10/5/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #12 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Joshua M. Weeks for Pierce Manufacturing, Inc., and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael N. Feder. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/1/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) [Transferred from nvd on 10/5/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #13 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Scott J. Pivnick for Pierce Manufacturing, Inc., and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael N. Feder. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/1/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) [Transferred from nvd on 10/5/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #10 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Emily Grand for Pierce Manufacturing, Inc., and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael N. Feder. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/1/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) [Transferred from nvd on 10/5/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #11 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lindsay C. Church for Pierce Manufacturing, Inc., and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael N. Feder. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/1/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) [Transferred from nvd on 10/5/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #14 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Todd B. Benoff for Pierce Manufacturing, Inc., and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael N. Feder. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/1/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) [Transferred from nvd on 10/5/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Todd B. Benoff and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael N. Feder (Filing fee $ 250 PAID; Receipt No. 0978-6150801) for Plaintiff Pierce Manufacturing Inc. (DRM) [Transferred from nvd on 10/5/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Scott J. Pivnick and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael N. Feder (Filing fee $ 250 PAID; Receipt No. 0978-6150700); appearing for Plaintiff Pierce Manufacturing Inc.. (DRM) [Transferred from nvd on 10/5/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Joshua M. Weeks and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael Feder (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6150795) by Plaintiff Pierce Manufacturing Inc.. (Feder, Michael)[Transferred from nvd on 10/5/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Lindsay C. Church and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael Feder (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6150682) by Plaintiff Pierce Manufacturing Inc.. (Feder, Michael) [Transferred from nvd on 10/5/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Emily Grand and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael Feder (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6150659) by Plaintiff Pierce Manufacturing Inc.. (Feder, Michael) [Transferred from nvd on 10/5/2020.]
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Spartan Fire LLC re ECF No. #1 Complaint, ECF No. #7 Proposed Summons. (KR) [Transferred from nvd on 10/5/2020.]
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (KR) [Transferred from nvd on 10/5/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Spartan Fire, LLC by Plaintiff Pierce Manufacturing Inc.. (Feder, Michael) [Transferred from nvd on 10/5/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Pierce Manufacturing Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Oshkosh Corporation for Pierce Manufacturing Inc. added. (Feder, Michael) [Transferred from nvd on 10/5/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV) [Transferred from nvd on 10/5/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Scott J. Pivnick to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/1/2020. (no image attached) (LE) [Transferred from nvd on 10/5/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Lindsay C. Church to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/1/2020. (no image attached) (LE) [Transferred from nvd on 10/5/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Joshua M. Weeks to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/1/2020. (no image attached) (LE) [Transferred from nvd on 10/5/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. Nature of Suit: 830/835 Patent Case (LE) [Transferred from nvd on 10/5/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6131381) by Pierce Manufacturing Inc.. Proof of service due by 11/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Civil Cover Sheet) (Feder, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. [Transferred from nvd on 10/5/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierce Manufacturing Inc v. Spartan Fire LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spartan Fire LLC
Represented By: Kenneth M Albridge, III
Represented By: Janine C Prupas
Represented By: J Ryan Gray
Represented By: Justin R Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pierce Manufacturing Inc
Represented By: Todd Benoff
Represented By: Emily Grand
Represented By: Joshua M Weeks
Represented By: Michael N Feder
Represented By: Lindsay C Church
Represented By: Scott J Pivnick
Represented By: Anthony S Baish
Represented By: Daniel T Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?