Shaw v. City of Milwaukee et al
Plaintiff: William Robert Shaw
Defendant: Thomas Wroblewski, Patrick Elm, Chief Edward Flynn, City of Milwaukee, Fire and Police Commission and Angela Gonzalez
Case Number: 1:2020cv01544
Filed: October 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TRANSMIT Complaint, Notice, Waiver, Consent and Order to USM for service upon City of Milwaukee, Chief Edward Flynn, Fire and Police Commission, Angela Gonzalez, Thomas Wroblewski and Patrick Elm. (lh)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCREENING ORDER GRANTING Shaw's #2 motion for leave to proceed without prepaying filing fee and DENYING Shaw's motion for class certification order signed by Judge William C. Griesbach on 12/3/2020. The U.S. Marshall shall serve a copy of the complaint and this order upon defendants pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party, Milwaukee County Sheriff and to Dennis Brand)(lh)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for a Class Action Certification Order by William Robert Shaw. (mac)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT in Support by William Robert Shaw re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Copy of Prisoner Trust Account Statement)(mac)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RESPONSE filed by William Robert Shaw re #6 Order Directing Prisoner Payment (lh)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that on or before 11/10/2020 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $1.67 as an initial partial filing fee in this action signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 10/20/20. (cc: all counsel and via US Mail to Shaw, Milwaukee County Sheriff and Dennis Brand)(Griesbach, William)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by William Robert Shaw. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (cmb)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Mailed. (cmb)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by William Robert Shaw. (cmb)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by William Robert Shaw. (cmb)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with jury demand filed against All Defendants by William Robert Shaw. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(cmb) Signature page attached on 10/7/2020 (tlf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaw v. City of Milwaukee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Wroblewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Elm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Edward Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Milwaukee
Represented By: Milwaukee County - 550, 555
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fire and Police Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Robert Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?