Ravet v. Saul
Plaintiff: Patrick G Ravet
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv01737
Filed: November 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 12/16/2020. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Pamela Pepper no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
December 15, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Andrew M Saul. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
December 9, 2020 Filing 5 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to parties. By 2/8/2021 defendant to file and serve certified administrative record. Plaintiff's brief due 3/22/2021; defendant's response due 5/2/2021; plaintiff's reply due 5/17/2021. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
December 7, 2020 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Service (Schultz, Barry)
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Patrick G Ravet. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Schultz, Barry)
November 18, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)
November 18, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Patrick G Ravet. (Schultz, Barry)
November 18, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Patrick G Ravet ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number BWIEDC-3641347) (Attachments: #1 AC decision, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schultz, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ravet v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick G Ravet
Represented By: Barry A Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?