Spangler v. Lichtensteiger et al
Plaintiff: Edward A Spangler
Defendant: Christopher Timm and Lt Lichtensteiger
Case Number: 1:2020cv01748
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Filing 10 JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk and approved by Judge William C Griesbach on 12/23/2020. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(cav)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 12/23/20 granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. This action is dismissed and the inmate has incurred a strike. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party and Warden)(Griesbach, William)
December 18, 2020 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $17.11, receipt number GB4689-5789. The payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (cav)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that within 30 days plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $17.11 as an initial partial filing fee in this action, signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 12/11/2020. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party, Warden)(Griesbach, William)
December 10, 2020 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Edward A Spangler. (mac)
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER from the Clerk to Edward A Spangler. Plaintiff is to submit a certified copy of his trust account statement to the court on or before 12/21/2020. (cc: All Counsel) (tlf)
November 30, 2020 Filing 5 Insufficient Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Edward A Spangler. (mac)
November 30, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Edward A Spangler. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (mac)
November 23, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to Edward Spangler re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting that a six-month certified prisoner trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (mac)
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Edward A Spangler. (mac)
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Edward A Spangler. (mac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spangler v. Lichtensteiger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Timm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt Lichtensteiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward A Spangler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?