Thunder Custom Products LLC v. Titan Robotics Ltd
Plaintiff: Thunder Custom Products LLC
Defendant: Titan Robotics Ltd
Case Number: 1:2020cv01752
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2020 Certified copies of #8 Order Remanding Case and docket sheet sent via U.S. Mail to Clerk of Court, Brown County Circuit Court. (tlf)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REMANDING CASE to Brown County Circuit Court, signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 12/16/2020. The Clerk is directed to send a certified copy of this Remand Order and docket Brown County Circuit Court. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
December 15, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION by Titan Robotics Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Remand)(Strampe, Frederick)
December 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David P Werley on behalf of Thunder Custom Products LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: David P Werley (Werley, David)
November 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: (cc: all counsel)Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 12/29/2020 at 10:00 AM in By Telephone before Judge William C Griesbach. The court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov(lh)
November 23, 2020 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (lh)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER to David Werley regarding Admission and ECF registration (jcl)
November 23, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Titan Robotics, Ltd.. (Strampe, Frederick)
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Titan Robotics, Ltd..(Strampe, Frederick)
November 23, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Titan Robotics, Ltd. from Brown County Circuit Court, Case Number: 20cv1034 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3645740) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons & Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Strampe, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thunder Custom Products LLC v. Titan Robotics Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Titan Robotics Ltd
Represented By: Frederick J Strampe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thunder Custom Products LLC
Represented By: David D Daul
Represented By: David P Werley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?