United States of America v. Timmers
Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: William Timmers
Case Number: 1:2020mc00006
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Rescheduled Hearing: Show Cause Hearing rescheduled to 5/28/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom 201, 125 S. Jefferson St., Green Bay, WI 54301 before Judge William C Griesbach. (cc: all counsel and via U.S. Mail to William Timmers)(tlf)
February 25, 2020 Filing 4 US Marshal 285 Form, William Timmers personally served with #2 Order to Show Cause on 2/25/2020. (lh)
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 TRANSMIT #1 Petition and #2 Order to Show Cause to USMS for service on William Timmers. (tlf)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 2/19/2020. Show Cause Hearing set for 4/17/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom 201, 125 S. Jefferson St., Green Bay, WI 54301 before Judge William C Griesbach. Show Cause Response due by 4/10/2020. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
February 14, 2020 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The cause of action chosen has been modified. The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. The nature of suit has been modified. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, for further guidance (cav)
February 13, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach (jcl)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION To Enforce Internal Revenue Service Summons filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 - Summons, #4 Exhibit 3 - Summons)(Flaherty, Maura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Timmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Maura S Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Timmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?