James v. Saul
Plaintiff: Kathy James
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2021cv00004
Filed: January 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Brett Ludwig
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan C Hugo on behalf of Andrew Saul. Attorney(s) appearing: Megan C. Hugo (Hugo, Megan)
February 10, 2021 Filing 9 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; US Attorney General served on 2/4/2021. (amb)
February 10, 2021 Filing 8 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; Commissioner of Social Security served on 1/21/2021. (amb)
January 7, 2021 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Andrew Saul. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 BRIEFING ORDER signed by Judge Brett Ludwig on 1/6/21 and electronically transmitted to the parties: Defendant to file and serve certified administrative record by 3/8/21. Plaintiffs brief due 4/19/21; Defendants response due 6/1/21; Plaintiffs reply due 6/16/21. (cc: all counsel) (MP)
January 5, 2021 Transmit #1 Complaint and #4 Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF. (blr)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Judge Brett Ludwig on 1/5/21 granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. (cc: all counsel) (MP)
January 4, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Kathy James. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Duncan, Dana)
January 4, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Brett Ludwig; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)
January 4, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Kathy James. (Duncan, Dana)
January 4, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Kathy James. (Duncan, Dana)
January 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul by Kathy James. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Duncan, Dana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Represented By: Megan C Hugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy James
Represented By: Dana W Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?